Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Brian S Miller
Case #: 4:17-cv-00575
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Case Filed:Sep 07, 2017
Terminated:Jul 24, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 06, 2018 2:25 AM CST
Defendant
Redstone Construction Group Inc
Represented By
Joel Franklin Hoover
Newland & Associates, PLLC
contact info
Ashley D. Peoples
Newland & Associates, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nathan Sipes
Represented By
Sean Short
Sanford Law Firm
contact info
Joshua Sanford
Sanford Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, July 24, 2018
14 14 order Judgment Tue 07/24 12:22 PM
JUDGMENT Consistent with13 Order, this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/24/2018. (mcz)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs order Order Tue 07/24 12:18 PM
ORDER dismissing case with prejudice pursuant to12 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/24/2018. (mcz)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 23, 2018
12 12 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 07/23 4:06 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Nathan Sipes. (Sanford, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 13, 2018
11 11 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 07/13 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Nathan Sipes (Sanford, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 10, 2018
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 07/10 1:52 PM
ORDER granting9 Defendant Redstone Construction Group, Inc.'s motion for leave to amend its answer. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/10/2018. (kdr)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 25, 2018
9 9 motion Leave to File Document Mon 06/25 4:56 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Amend Answer to Original Complaint by Redstone Construction Group Inc(Peoples, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Wednesday, January 31, 2018
8 8 order Scheduling Order Wed 01/31 3:40 PM
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/22/2018 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. Discovery due by 7/24/2018. Motions due by 8/23/2018. Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 9/21/2018. Status Report due by 8/23/2018. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 1/31/18. (lp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2018
7 7 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Wed 01/17 5:27 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Nathan Sipes. (Sanford, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2017
6 6 order Initial Scheduling Order Thu 10/26 1:07 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 1/4/2018. Rule 26(f) Report due by 1/18/2018. Jury Trial set for 10/22/2018 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 10/26/2017. (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2017
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/27 4:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Franklin Hoover on behalf of Redstone Construction Group Inc (Hoover, Joel)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Wed 09/27 4:39 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Redstone Construction Group Inc (Peoples, Ashley)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/27 4:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley D. Peoples on behalf of Redstone Construction Group Inc (Peoples, Ashley)
Related: [-]
2 2 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 09/27 4:35 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand Answer to Original Complaint by Redstone Construction Group Inc.(Peoples, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2017
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 09/07 3:58 PM
COMPLAINT against Redstone Construction Group, Inc., filed by Nathan Sipes. Fee of $ 400 paid. Receipt Number LIT063570. Summons issued.(kdr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet