Amstar Emergency Medical Services Inc v. Verstandig et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-03037
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-03037
Alabama Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Henry A Callaway |
Case #: | 2:17-ap-00070 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other |
Case Filed: | Sep 07, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 13, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Jacob Verstandig
1459 East 13th Street
Brooklyn, NY 11230 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fundrock, LLC
1080 McDonald Avenue
Brooklyn, NY 11218 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Solomon Feig
1080 McDonald Avenue
Brooklyn, NY 11218 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Midnight Advance, LLC
128 32nd Street
Brooklyn, NY 11232 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Solomon Rozenberg
128 32nd Street
Brooklyn, NY 11232 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amstar Emergency Medical Services Inc
P.O. Box 480547
Linden, AL 36748 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 06/13 1:38 PM
Adversary Case # 2:17-ap-70 Closed. (KJF) |
||
Sunday, May 27, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 05/27 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 05/27/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, May 25, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
order
Final Order on Complaint
Fri 05/25 1:40 PM
FINAL Order and Judgment On Complaint in Adversary Proceeding # 17-00070 Signed on 5/25/2018 Objections to Adversarial Final Order due by 6/8/2018. (PDH) |
|
Saturday, February 17, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 02/17 11:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 02/17/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
order
Scheduling Order - Adversary
Thu 02/15 1:24 PM
Scheduling Order Signed on 2/15/2018. Discovery due by 5/29/2018. Trial date set for 7/19/2018 at 10:00 AM at HAC-Federal Building, Second Floor, 908 Alabama Ave., Selma, AL 36701. (LML) |
|
23 | 23
court
Minute Entry
Thu 02/15 12:29 PM
Minute Entry: Hearing Date: 2/15/2018. |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
court
Notice of Hearing Set
Thu 01/18 11:56 AM
Notice Resetting Scheduling Conference Set on Hearing rescheduled for 2/15/2018 at 08:45 AM at HAC - Judges Conference Room. (AB) |
|
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
court
Minute Entry
Thu 01/04 10:25 AM
Minute Entry: Hearing Date: 1/4/2018. |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
court
Minute Entry
Thu 11/30 2:58 PM
Minute Entry: Hearing Date: 11/30/2017. |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 11/15 11:45 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 11/15/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Dismiss Party
Mon 11/13 4:41 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Party Signed on 11/13/2017. (KJF) |
|
Sunday, October 29, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 10/29 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 10/29/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
court
Notice of Hearing Set
Fri 10/27 11:23 AM
Notice of Telephonic Status Hearing Set on Hearing scheduled for 11/30/2017 at 08:30 AM at HAC - Judges Conference Room. (AB) |
|
15 | 15
court
Minute Entry
Fri 10/27 11:22 AM
Minute Entry: Hearing Date: 10/26/2017. |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 10/19 2:15 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Fundrock, LLC, Midnight Advance, LLC, Solomon Rozenberg (Friedman, Barry) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney
Thu 10/12 4:32 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Filed by Midnight Advance, LLC, Solomon Rozenberg (Hartley, Jeffery) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
court
Notice of Filing Error - No Action Taken by Court
Wed 10/11 2:49 PM
Notice of Filing Error - Incorrect Docket Event. Document attached is not appropriate for the docket event selected. IF action is required of the court, the document should be refiled using the proper CM/ECF Docket Event. (NOTICE OF WITHDRAWL OF ATTORNEY). No Action has been taken by the court regarding this filing. Document has been terminated. (AB) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Withdraw As Attorney
Wed 10/11 10:00 AM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney - Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel of Record Filed by Midnight Advance, LLC, Solomon Rozenberg (Hartley, Jeffery) |
|
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 10/04 12:16 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jeffery J. Hartley Filed by on behalf of Midnight Advance, LLC, Solomon Rozenberg (Hartley, Jeffery) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 09/29 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 09/29/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
court
Notice of Hearing Set
Wed 09/27 11:29 AM
Notice of Hearing Set on Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2017 at 09:00 AM at HAC-Federal Building, Second Floor, 908 Alabama Ave., Selma, AL 36701. (AB) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss Party
Wed 09/27 8:30 AM
Motion to Dismiss Party (Jacob Verstandig and Solomon Feig) Filed by Samuel Stephens on behalf of Amstar Emergency Medical Services Inc. (Stephens, Samuel) |
|
6 | 6
court
Notice of Filing Error - No Action Taken by Court
Wed 09/27 8:26 AM
Notice of Filing Error - Incorrect Motion Event. Document attached is not appropriate for the docket event selected. IF action is required of the court, the document should be refiled using the proper CM/ECF Motion Event. (LML) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Dismissal
Tue 09/26 11:41 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Jacob Verstandig and Solomon Feig Filed by Amstar Emergency Medical Services Inc (Stephens, Samuel) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 09/11 9:35 AM
Summons Service Executed on Solomon Feig ; Fundrock, LLC ; Midnight Advance, LLC ; Solomon Rozenberg ; Jacob Verstandig . (Stephens, Samuel) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Fri 09/08 5:06 PM
Summons Issued on Solomon Feig Date Issued 9/8/2017, Answer Due 10/10/2017; Fundrock, LLC Date Issued 9/8/2017, Answer Due 10/10/2017; Midnight Advance, LLC Date Issued 9/8/2017, Answer Due 10/10/2017; Solomon Rozenberg Date Issued 9/8/2017, Answer Due 10/10/2017; Jacob Verstandig Date Issued 9/8/2017, Answer Due 10/10/2017 (KJF) |
|
2 | 2
court
Notice of Scheduling Conference Set
Fri 09/08 5:02 PM
Notice of Scheduling Conference Set Scheduling Conference Hearing set for 10/26/2017 at 09:00 AM at HAC-Federal Building, Second Floor, 908 Alabama Ave., Selma, AL 36701. (KJF) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 09/07 4:08 PM
Adversary case 17-00070 Complaint by Lee R. Benton, Samuel Stephens on behalf of Amstar Emergency Medical Services Inc against Jacob Verstandig, Fundrock, LLC, Solomon Feig, Midnight Advance, LLC, Solomon Rozenberg. Fee Amount $350 (02 (Other)). (Stephens, Samuel) |