New Jersey District Court
Judge:John Michael Vazquez
Referred: Steven C Mannion
Case #: 2:17-cv-06888
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2017
Re-opened:Jan 05, 2018
Terminated:Jan 05, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 07, 2018 4:01 AM EST
Defendant
PRUVIT VENTURES, INC.
Represented By
J. BARRY COCOZIELLO
Connell Foley LLP
contact info
LISA J. TREMBLY
Connell Foley LLP
contact info
Defendant
BRIAN UNDERWOOD
Represented By
J. BARRY COCOZIELLO
Connell Foley LLP
contact info
LISA J. TREMBLY
Connell Foley LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
KOSHER SUPERVISION SERVICES INC.
Represented By
ROBERT PAUL GAMMEL
Law Offices Of Jan Meyer & Associates, P.C.
contact info
JAN MEYER
Law Offices Of Jan Meyer & Associates P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, January 05, 2018
16 16 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Mon 01/08 9:26 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice, and without costs. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 1/5/18. (cm, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2017
15 15 2 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Mon 12/04 3:10 PM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 30 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 1/3/2018. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 12/4/17. (cm, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2017
14 14 misc Letter Fri 12/01 4:06 PM
Letter from All Counsel Advising of Settlement. (COCOZIELLO, J.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2017
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Wed 11/29 12:32 PM
Answer Due Deadline Update - The document13 Order submitted by BRIAN UNDERWOOD, PRUVIT VENTURES, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/1/17. (cm, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2017
13 13 1 pgs order Order Wed 11/29 12:31 PM
CONSENT ORDER granting Defendant's an extension of time to respond to the complaint until 12/1/17. re12 Letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 11/28/17. (cm, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2017
12 12 misc Letter Mon 11/27 4:47 PM
Letter from All Counsel Regarding Joint Request to Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint re11 Order.(COCOZIELLO, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, October 30, 2017
11 11 1 pgs order Order Mon 10/30 3:03 PM
CONSENT ORDER extending Defendant's time to file an answer to the complaint until 11/27/17, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 10/30/17. (cm, )
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Mon 10/30 3:05 PM
Answer Due Deadline Update - The document11 Order submitted by BRIAN UNDERWOOD, PRUVIT VENTURES, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/27/17. (cm, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2017
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Fri 10/27 9:58 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document10 Letter submitted by PRUVIT VENTURES, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/30/17. (cm, )
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Fri 10/27 9:58 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document10 Letter submitted by BRIAN UNDERWOOD has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/2/17. (cm, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2017
10 10 misc Letter Thu 10/26 1:29 PM
Letter from Defense Counsel on Behalf of All Parties requesting Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint.(COCOZIELLO, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/26 10:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by LISA J. TREMBLY on behalf of All Defendants (TREMBLY, LISA)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Thu 10/26 10:41 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants.. (COCOZIELLO, J.)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/26 10:38 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by J. BARRY COCOZIELLO on behalf of All Defendants (COCOZIELLO, J.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2017
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/17 2:42 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by KOSHER SUPERVISION SERVICES INC., KOSHER SUPERVISION SERVICES INC.. BRIAN UNDERWOOD served on 9/28/2017, answer due 10/19/2017. (GAMMEL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/17 2:40 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by KOSHER SUPERVISION SERVICES INC., KOSHER SUPERVISION SERVICES INC.. PRUVIT VENTURES, INC. served on 9/25/2017, answer due 10/16/2017. (GAMMEL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2017
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/11 9:13 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT PAUL GAMMEL on behalf of KOSHER SUPERVISION SERVICES INC., KOSHER SUPERVISION SERVICES INC. (GAMMEL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2017
3 3 misc AO120 Patent/Trademark Form Fri 09/08 4:42 PM
AO120 Trademark Form filed. (jr)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 09/08 4:40 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to PRUVIT VENTURES, INC., BRIAN UNDERWOOD Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *John Reilly* (jr)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/08 12:54 PM
COMPLAINT against PRUVIT VENTURES, INC., BRIAN UNDERWOOD ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8076468) with JURY DEMAND, filed by KOSHER SUPERVISION SERVICES INC., KOSHER SUPERVISION SERVICES INC. DBA KOF-K KOSHER SUPERVISION.(MEYER, JAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 09/08 4:39 PM
Case assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. (jr)
Related: [-]