Derek L Gustafson D.D.S., P.A. v. On Deck Capital, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:17-bk-50530
Lead BK case is: 5:17-bk-50530
Minnesota Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Robert J Kressel |
Case #: | 5:17-ap-05119 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 26, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
On Deck Capital, Inc.
1400 Broadway 25th Floor
New York, NY 10018 |
|
Plaintiff
Derek L Gustafson D.D.S., P.A.
2011 3rd Avenue East
Hibbing, MN 55746 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:07 PM CDT |
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
MNB Stipulation of dismissal
Fri 01/26 9:50 AM
Stipulation of dismissal filed by Derek L Gustafson D.D.S., P.A. and On Deck Capital, Inc.. Proposed order.(Nosek, Steven) |
|
utility
MNB Disposition of adversary
Fri 01/26 12:52 PM
Disposition of adversary 5:17-ap-5119. Disposition: Dismissed. (AnitaM MNBD) |
||
court
MNB Close adversary case
Fri 01/26 12:53 PM
Adversary case 5:17-ap-5119 closed (AnitaM MNBD) |
||
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
MNB Stipulation or agreement
Mon 01/22 12:54 PM
Stipulation filed by Derek L Gustafson D.D.S., P.A. and On Deck Capital, Inc.. Nature of stipulation: Stipulation for Settlement(Nosek, Steven) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
MNB Order for trial
Fri 11/17 10:59 AM
Order for trial Discovery due by 1/16/2018. Trial date set for 3/19/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 515 W First Street, Duluth, Judge Robert J. Kressel. (AnitaM MNBD) |
|
Friday, November 10, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
answer
MNB Answer to complaint
Fri 11/10 10:02 AM
Answer to complaint with demand for jury trial filed by On Deck Capital, Inc.. Proof of service. |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Saturday, October 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sat 10/07 11:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 10/07/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
MNB Order (Generic)
Thu 10/05 11:20 AM
Order Extending Time To Answer Complaint Re: (RJK) (Sherri MNBD) |
|
4 | 4
misc
MNB Stipulation or agreement
Thu 10/05 10:19 AM
Stipulation filed by Derek L Gustafson D.D.S., P.A. and On Deck Capital, Inc.. Proposed order. Nature of stipulation: extension of time to file answer(Nosek, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MNB Certificate of service
Tue 09/26 10:36 AM
Certificate of service filed by Derek L Gustafson D.D.S., P.A..(Nosek, Steven) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
court
MNB Summons for adversary proceeding
Mon 09/11 4:36 PM
Summons issued on On Deck Capital, Inc. Date Issued 9/11/2017, Answer Due 10/11/2017 (AnitaM MNBD) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
MNB Complaint (fee)
Mon 09/11 12:22 PM
Adversary case 17-05119 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by Derek L Gustafson D.D.S., P.A. against On Deck Capital, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Nosek, Steven) |