Vitamin World (V.I.), Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-11933
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-11933
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kevin J Carey |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-11938 |
Case Filed: | Sep 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 12, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Vitamin World (V.I.), Inc.
4320 Veterans Memorial Hwy
Holbrook, NY 11741-4504 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 5 minutes ago |
Tuesday, January 22, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
claims
Claims Register
Tue 01/22 3:45 PM
Final Claims Register . Filed by JND Corporate Restructuring. (JND Corporate Restructuring) |
|
Wednesday, December 12, 2018 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Wed 12/12 11:31 AM
Bankruptcy Case 17-11938 Closed (LMD) |
||
Tuesday, December 11, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Dismissing Case - Claims Agent
Wed 12/12 9:18 AM
Order Dismissing Chapter 11 Cases. Order Signed on 12/11/2018 Tickle due by: 1/11/2019. (LMD) |
|
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
claims
Claims Register
Thu 10/11 4:25 PM
Quarterly Claims Register . Filed by JND Corporate Restructuring. (JND Corporate Restructuring) |
|
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
claims
Claims Register
Mon 07/16 2:28 PM
Final Claims Register . Filed by JND Corporate Restructuring. (JND Corporate Restructuring) |
|
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
claims
Claims Register
Fri 07/06 6:30 PM
Quarterly Claims Register . Filed by JND Corporate Restructuring. (JND Corporate Restructuring) |
|
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
claims
Claims Register
Wed 04/04 9:38 PM
Quarterly Claims Register . Filed by JND Corporate Restructuring. (JND Corporate Restructuring) |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic
Tue 03/27 9:36 AM
Motion to convert was filed in main case ( 17-11933 . Receipt Number 90238, Fee Amount $15.00 (COH) |
||
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
claims
Claims Register
Wed 01/03 6:44 PM
Quarterly Claims Register . Filed by JND Corporate Restructuring. (JND Corporate Restructuring) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Schedules/Statements
Thu 10/26 10:14 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Vitamin World (V.I.), Inc.. (DiSabatino, Monique) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Schedules/Statements
Thu 10/26 10:13 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Vitamin World (V.I.), Inc.. (DiSabatino, Monique) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
claims
Claims Register
Tue 10/03 5:46 PM
Quarterly Claims Register . Filed by JND Corporate Restructuring. (JND Corporate Restructuring) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Amended Petition
Fri 09/15 8:33 AM
Amended Petition to Add County Filed by Vitamin World (V.I.), Inc.. (DiSabatino, Monique) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order-Joint Admin
Thu 09/14 11:16 AM
Order Granting Motion for Joint Administration. An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the Chapter 11 case of VWRE Holdings, Inc., 17-11934 VW Interholdings, Inc., 17-11935 VW Online, Inc., 17-11936 Precision Engineering Limited (USA), 17-11937 Vitamin World (V.I), Inc., 17-11938 Vitamin Depot, LLC, 17-11939 Vitamin World Of Guam, LLC, 17-11940 Nutrition Warehouse, Inc., 17-11941 The docket in the Chapter 11 case of Vitamin World, Inc., Case No. 17-11933 (KJC), should be consulted for all matters affecting this case Order Signed on 9/14/2017 (LMD) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 09/12 2:00 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-11938 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8579383, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Tue 09/12 8:08 AM
Judge Kevin J. Carey added to case. (SG) |
||
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
21
pgs
misc
RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 09/11 8:02 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Vitamin World (V.I.), Inc.. (Minuti, Mark) |