Bernard et al v. Lombardo et al
Connecticut District Court | |
Judge: | Michael P Shea |
Case #: | 3:17-mc-00174 |
Nature of Suit | 999 Civil - Miscellaneous |
Cause | Registration of Foreign Judgment |
Case Filed: | Sep 12, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 64 minutes ago |
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Writ Returned
Mon 12/18 11:59 AM
WRIT of Financial Institution Execution Returned Executed as to LJL Holding Corporation. (Lowry, Houston) |
|
Tuesday, October 17, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Appointment of Special Process Server
Tue 10/17 10:34 AM
ORDER Granting5 Motion for Appointment of Special Process Server. Signed by Clerk on 10/17/2017. (Hernandez, T.) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Appointment of Special Process Server
Fri 10/13 4:36 PM
MOTION for Appointment of Special Process Server by William N. Bernard, Willam N. Bernard and Catherine H. Bernard Revocable Living Trust. (Lowry, Houston) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Writ Issued
Thu 10/12 1:02 PM
WRIT of Execution Financial Institution issued. (Hernandez, T.) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Application for Writ
Wed 10/11 3:38 PM
APPLICATION for Writ of execution re: financial institution by William N. Bernard, Willam N. Bernard and Catherine H. Bernard Revocable Living Trust. (Lowry, Houston) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Electronic Filing Order
Wed 09/13 12:46 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 09/12/2017.(Hernandez, T.) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Registration of Foreign Judgment
Tue 09/12 4:00 PM
Registration of Foreign Judgment from the District of Southern District of New York in favor of William N. Bernard and The William N. Bernard and Catherine H. Bernard Revocable Living Trust against non party LJL Holding Corporation.( Filing fee $ 47.00 receipt number ctxh00013063.), filed by William N. Bernard, William N. Bernard and Catherine H. Bernard Revocable Living Trust.(Hernandez, T.) Modified on 9/12/2017 to correct a the spelling for William(Hernandez, T.) |