United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority v. An Easement and Right-of-Way over 0.05 acre of land, more or less, in Oktibbeha County, Mississippi et al
Mississippi Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Glen H Davidson |
Referred: | David A Sanders |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00144 |
Nature of Suit | 210 Real Property - Land Condemnation |
Cause | 28:1358 Land Condemnation |
Case Filed: | Sep 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 18, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 11, 2018 4:44 AM CDT |
Defendant
An Easement and Right-of-Way over 0.05 acre of land, more or less, in Oktibbeha County, Mississippi
|
|
Defendant
Billy Dumas
|
|
Defendant
Glen Dumas
|
|
Plaintiff
United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, January 18, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
4
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion
Fri 01/18 4:09 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION re16 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 1/17/19. (jla) |
|
16 | 16
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Fri 01/18 4:09 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Summary Judgment and DISBURSING FUNDS. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 1/17/19. (jla) |
|
Thursday, September 27, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
11
pgs
misc
Memorandum in Support
Thu 09/27 12:23 PM
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re14 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Order Regarding Disbursement of Just Compensation to Defendants . (Davis-Primer, Nakimuli) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Summary Judgment
Thu 09/27 12:20 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment and Order Regarding Disbursement of Just Compensation to Defendants by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority. (Davis-Primer, Nakimuli) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Ivan J. Antal, II | ||
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
utility
Remark
Tue 07/03 12:22 PM
Remark; Letter of Introduction for James S. Chase as counsel for TVA (jla) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 01/31 4:00 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Elizabeth Anne Birdwell terminated. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 1/29/18. (jla) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 01/29 11:40 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Elizabeth A. Birdwell by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority. (Birdwell, Elizabeth) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 01/29 9:37 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James S. Chase on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Chase, James) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 10/31 2:56 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Anne Birdwell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Birdwell, Elizabeth) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Service
Tue 10/31 2:11 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Complaint; Declaration of Taking; Notice of Condemnation; Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession; Memorandum in Support of Motion; Order of Possession; and Notice of Service; and Attachments thereto by Nakimuli O. Davis-Primer on behalf of United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority to Billy Dumas. (Davis-Primer, Nakimuli) |
|
Monday, October 09, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Service
Mon 10/09 10:28 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Complaint, Declaration of Taking, Notice of Condemnation and Attachments thereto by Nakimuli O. Davis-Primer on behalf of United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority to Glen Dumas. (Davis-Primer, Nakimuli) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 10/05 11:11 AM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Immediate Possession. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 10/4/17. |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
4
pgs
misc
Memorandum in Support
Tue 10/03 4:17 PM
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re4 MOTION for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession filed by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority. (Davis-Primer, Nakimuli) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 10/03 4:16 PM
MOTION for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority. (Davis-Primer, Nakimuli) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
utility
Remark
Wed 09/13 11:19 AM
Remark; Receipt No. MSN100002766 in the amount of $350 deposited into the registry of the court (jla) |
||
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Notice of Condemnation
Tue 09/12 3:56 PM
NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority. (Davis-Primer, Nakimuli) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Easement Description | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 09/12 3:55 PM
NOTICE by Nakimuli O. Davis-Primer on behalf of United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority Declaration of Taking (Davis-Primer, Nakimuli) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Easement Description, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Map | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/12 3:43 PM
COMPLAINT,, filed by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority. (jla) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Easement Description, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
notice
Notice of Assignment
Tue 09/12 3:44 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla) |