United States of America v. An Easement and Right-of-Way Over 0.38 Acres of Land, More or Less, In Oktibbeha County, Mississippi et al
Mississippi Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Glen H Davidson |
Referred: | David A Sanders |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00145 |
Nature of Suit | 210 Real Property - Land Condemnation |
Cause | 28:1358 Land Condemnation |
Case Filed: | Sep 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 22, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 11, 2018 4:39 AM CDT |
Defendant
An Easement and Right-of-Way Over 0.38 Acres of Land, More or Less, In Oktibbeha County, Mississippi
|
|
Defendant
Glenn E. Mullins
|
|
Defendant
Nancy J. Mullins
|
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Judgment Order
Wed 11/22 12:09 PM
JUDGMENT AND ORDER DISBURSING FUNDS. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 11/22/17. (cr) |
|
11 | 11
3
pgs
order
Order
Wed 11/22 12:05 PM
ORDER SETTLING INTEREST OF DEFENDANTS GLENN E. MULLINS AND NANCY J. MULLINS AND DISBURSING FUNDS. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 11/22/17. (cr) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 11/21 3:24 PM
MOTION for Entry of a Judgment and Agreed Order Settling Interest and Disbursing Funds (Unopposed) by United States of America. (Davis-Primer, Nakimuli) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 10/31 2:57 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Anne Birdwell on behalf of United States of America (Birdwell, Elizabeth) |
|
Monday, October 09, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Service
Mon 10/09 10:30 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Complaint, Declaration of Taking, Notice of Condemnation and Attachments thereto by Nakimuli O. Davis-Primer on behalf of United States of America to Nancy J. Mullins. (Davis-Primer, Nakimuli) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Service
Mon 10/09 10:29 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Complaint, Declaration of Taking, Notice of Condemnation and Attachments thereto by Nakimuli O. Davis-Primer on behalf of United States of America to Glenn E. Mullins. (Davis-Primer, Nakimuli) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 10/05 11:13 AM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Immediate Possession. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 10/4/17. |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
4
pgs
misc
Memorandum in Support
Tue 10/03 4:14 PM
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re4 MOTION for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession filed by United States of America. (Davis-Primer, Nakimuli) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 10/03 4:13 PM
MOTION for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession by United States of America. (Davis-Primer, Nakimuli) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
utility
Remark
Wed 09/13 11:20 AM
Remark; Receipt No. MSN100002767 in the amount of $14,325 deposited into the registry of the court (jla) |
||
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Notice of Condemnation
Tue 09/12 4:03 PM
NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by United States of America. (Davis-Primer, Nakimuli) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Easement Description | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 09/12 4:02 PM
NOTICE by Nakimuli O. Davis-Primer on behalf of United States of America Declaration of Takin (Davis-Primer, Nakimuli) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Easement Description, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Map | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/12 3:49 PM
COMPLAINT,, filed by United States of America. |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Easement Description, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
notice
Notice of Assignment
Tue 09/12 3:50 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Glen H. Davidson and Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. |