Seadrill Cressida Ltd DO NOT DOCKET IN THIS CASE. Jointly Administered under Case #17-60079-H2-11. This message does not apply to adversary proceedings or claims registers.
Member Case
Lead case is: 6:17-bk-60079
Lead case is: 6:17-bk-60079
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 6:17-bk-60108 |
Case Filed: | Sep 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 02, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
# of Creditors | 10,001-25,000 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,000,001 to $50 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,000,001 to $50 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago |
Monday, January 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
trustee
Remark (batch)
Mon 01/22 2:03 PM
Remark: Judge Marvin Isgur randomly reassigned and added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated . (DawnaKelly) |
|
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 04/16 2:41 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed per Order #1390 in 17-60079 (ltie) |
||
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 09/16 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/15/2017. (Admin.) |
|
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 09/16 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/15/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
court
Document
Wed 09/13 11:42 AM
An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of Texas directing joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of: Seadrill Limited Case No. 17-60079 Eastern Drilling AS Case No. 17-35367 North Atlantic Alpha Ltd. Case No. 17-60082 North Atlantic Crew AS Case No. 17-60083 North Atlantic Crewing Ltd. Case No. 17-60084 North Atlantic Drilling Ltd. Case No. 17-60080 North Atlantic Drilling UK Ltd. Case No. 17-35368 North Atlantic Elara Ltd. Case No. 17-60085 North Atlantic Epsilon Ltd. Case No. 17-60086 North Atlantic Linus Charterer Ltd. Case No. 17-60087 North Atlantic Management AS Case No. 17-35369 North Atlantic Navigator Ltd. Case No. 17-60088 North Atlantic Norway Ltd. Case No. 17-60089 North Atlantic Phoenix Ltd. Case No. 17-60090 North Atlantic Support Services Limited Case No. 17-60091 North Atlantic Venture Ltd. Case No. 17-60092 Scorpion Drilling Ltd. Case No. 17-60093 Scorpion Intrepid Ltd. Case No. 17-60094 Scorpion Servicos Offshore Ltda Case No. 17-60095 Scorpion Vigilant Ltd. Case No. 17-60096 Sea Dragon de Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V. Case No. 17-60097 Seadrill Abu Dhabi Operations Limited Case No. 17-60098 Seadrill Americas, Inc. Case No. 17-60077 Seadrill Angola, Lda. Case No. 17-60099 Seadrill Aquila Ltd. Case No. 17-60100 Seadrill Ariel Ltd. Case No. 17-60101 Seadrill Brunei Ltd. Case No. 17-60102 Seadrill Callisto Ltd. Case No. 17-60103 Seadrill Capital Spares Pool AS Case No. 17-60104 Seadrill Carina Ltd. Case No. 17-60105 Seadrill Castor Ltd. Case No. 17-60106 Seadrill Castor Pte. Ltd. Case No. 17-60107 Seadrill Cressida Ltd. Case No. 17-60108 Seadrill Deepwater Charterer Ltd. Case No. 17-60109 Seadrill Deepwater Crewing Ltd. Case No. 17-60110 Seadrill Deepwater Units Pte. Ltd. Case No. 17-60111 Seadrill Dorado Ltd. Case No. 17-60112 Seadrill Draco Ltd. Case No. 17-60113 Seadrill Eclipse Ltd. Case No. 17-60114 Seadrill Eminence Ltd. Case No. 17-60115 Seadrill Far East Limited Case No. 17-60116 Seadrill Freedom Ltd. Case No. 17-60117 Seadrill GCC Operations Ltd. Case No. 17-60118 Seadrill Gemini Ltd. Case No. 17-60119 Seadrill Global Services Ltd. Case No. 17-60120 Seadrill Gulf Operations Neptune LLC Case No. 17-60121 Seadrill Indonesia Ltd. Case No. 17-60122 Seadrill International Resourcing DMCC Case No. 17-60123 Seadrill Jack Up Holding Ltd. Case No. 17-60124 Seadrill Jack Up I B.V. Case No. 17-60126 Seadrill Jack Up II B.V. Case No. 17-60127 Seadrill Jupiter Ltd. Case No. 17-60125 Seadrill Labuan Ltd. Case No. 17-60128 Seadrill Libra Ltd. Case No. 17-60129 Seadrill Management (S) Pte. Ltd. Case No. 17-60130 Seadrill Management AME Ltd. Case No. 17-60131 Seadrill Management Ltd. Case No. 17-60132 Seadrill Neptune Hungary Kft. Case No. 17-60133 Seadrill Newfoundland Operations Ltd. Case No. 17-60134 Seadrill Nigeria Operations Limited Case No. 17-60135 Seadrill Offshore AS Case No. 17-60136 Seadrill Offshore Malaysia Sdn. Bhd. Case No. 17-60137 Seadrill Offshore Nigeria Limited Case No. 17-60138 Seadrill Operations de Mexico, S. de R.L. de C.V. Case No. 17-60139 Seadrill Orion Ltd. Case No. 17-60140 Seadrill Pegasus (S) Pte. Ltd. Case No. 17-60141 Seadrill Prospero Ltd. Case No. 17-60142 Seadrill Saturn Ltd. Case No. 17-60143 Seadrill Servicos de Petroleo Ltda Case No. 17-60144 Seadrill Telesto Ltd. Case No. 17-60145 Seadrill Tellus Ltd. Case No. 17-60146 Seadrill Tucana Ltd. Case No. 17-60147 Seadrill UK Ltd. Case No. 17-60148 Sevan Brasil Ltd. Case No. 17-60149 Sevan Driller Ltd. Case No. 17-60150 Sevan Drilling Limited (Bermuda) Case No. 17-60081 Sevan Drilling Limited (UK) Case No. 17-60151 Sevan Drilling North America LLC Case No. 17-60078 Sevan Drilling Pte. Ltd. Case No. 17-60152 Sevan Drilling Rig II AS Case No. 17-60153 Sevan Drilling Rig II Pte. Ltd. Case No. 17-60154 Sevan Drilling Rig V AS Case No. 17-60155 Sevan Drilling Rig V Pte. Ltd. Case No. 17-60156 Sevan Drilling Rig VI AS Case No. 17-60157 Sevan Louisiana Hungary Kft. Case No. 17-60158 Sevan Marine Servicos de Perfuracao Ltda Case No. 17-60159 All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in Case No. 17-60079 (DRJ) |
|
3 | 3
order
Joint Administration
Wed 09/13 9:59 AM
Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of the Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief Signed on 9/13/2017 (aalo) |
|
2 | 2
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists
Wed 09/13 6:30 AM
|
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
21
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event]
Tue 09/12 6:02 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Seadrill Cressida Ltd. (Cavenaugh, Matthew) |
|
crditcrd
none
Tue 09/12 7:24 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-60108 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 19355911. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |