Local 812 Health Fund et al v. Ulrich
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Kenneth M Karas |
Referred: | Andrew E Krause |
Case #: | 7:17-cv-07023 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1109 Breach of Fiduciary Duties |
Case Filed: | Sep 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 29, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 13, 2018 4:51 AM EDT |
Defendant
John Ulrich
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Local 812 Health Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Local 812 Health Fund
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, September 30, 2022 | ||
misc
Mail Order by USPS
Fri 09/30 9:43 AM
Mailed a copy of88 Memo Endorsement, to John Ulrich 86606-054 FCI Butner Low Federal Correctional Institution P.O. BOX 999 Butner, NC 27509. (dsh) |
||
Thursday, September 29, 2022 | ||
88 | 88
![]() MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (162 in 7:17-cv-00137-KMK-AEK) Letter, filed by Soft Drink, Brewery Workers and Delivery Empoyees, Industrial Employees, Warehousemen, Helpers and Miscellaneous Workers, Greater New York and Vicinity, Local Union No. 812. ENDORSEMENT: The Court grants Plaintiffs' request to dismiss these two cases without prejudice. Plaintiffs' request is reasonable in light of the difficulties they would have in recovering any judgment against Mr. Ulrich at the present time. However, if circumstances should change, Plaintiffs should not be denied an opportunity to pursue any viable remedies. The upcoming conference is canceled. The Clerk is respectfully requested to close these cases without prejudice and to mail a copy of this memo endorsed letter to Mr. Ulrich. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/29/2022) (jca) |
|
87 | 87
![]() LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Susan Bruno dated 09/29/22 re: conference call of 10/6/22. Document filed by Local 812 Health Fund, Trustees of the Local 812 Health Fund..(Bruno, Susan) |
|
misc
Mail Order by USPS
Thu 09/29 9:12 AM
Mailed a copy of86 Memo Endorsement, Set Deadlines/Hearings, to John Ulrich 86606-054 FCI Butner Low Federal Correctional Institution P.O. BOX 999 Butner, NC 27509. (dsh) |
||
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
86 | 86
![]() MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: (85 in 7:17-cv-07023-KMK-AEK) Letter filed by Local 812 Health Fund, Trustees of the Local 812 Health Fund, (160 in 7:17-cv-00137-KMK-AEK) Letter, filed by Soft Drink, Brewery Workers and Delivery Empoyees, Industrial Employees, Warehousemen, Helpers and Miscellaneous Workers, Greater New York and Vicinity, Local Union No. 812. ENDORSEMENT: In light of Plaintiffs' position in this letter, the Court does not see the need for a conference. The Court is inclined to grant Plaintiffs' request to dismiss the cases and to do so without prejudice for the reasons noted herein. In light of this, Plaintiffs are to advise the Court by 9/29 if they prefer that route and if they still believea conference is necessary, particularly in light of the difficulties in securing Defendant's participation. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/27/2022) (ama) |
|
Tuesday, September 27, 2022 | ||
85 | 85
![]() LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Susan Bruno dated 09/27/22 re: conference call of 10/6/22. Document filed by Local 812 Health Fund, Trustees of the Local 812 Health Fund..(Bruno, Susan) |