Kilpatrick v. Weiss
Original Case: 1:17-cv-05112
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02831 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 02, 2018 |
Last checked: Thursday Jan 04, 2018 3:30 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
David Weiss, M.D.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Gregory D. Kilpatrick
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/04/2018 3:28 AM EST |
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Gregory D. Kilpatrick, FILED. [2123793] 17-2831 [Entered: 09/13/2017 03:49 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 5 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 7 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER OF DISMISSAL, dated 08/21/2017, RECEIVED.[2123807] 17-2831 [Entered: 09/13/2017 03:53 PM] | |
3 | 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2123810] 17-2831 [Entered: 09/13/2017 03:54 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED | ||
4 | 4 1 pgs INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2123813] 17-2831 [Entered: 09/13/2017 03:55 PM] |