T&T Air, LLC v. Arnold & Itkin LLP
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-31125
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-31125
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:17-ap-03396 |
Nature of Suit | 21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property |
Case Filed: | Sep 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 28, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Arnold & Itkin LLP
6009 Memorial Drive
Houston, TX 77007 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
T&T Air, LLC
8319 Thoia Lane #M31
Spring, TX 77379 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 03/01 12:02 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 02/28/2018. (Admin.) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 02/28 10:02 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3396 Closed. (aalo) |
||
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
Generic Order
Mon 02/26 11:29 AM
Stipulation and Agreed Order Signed on 2/26/2018 (LinhthuDo) |
|
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Stipulation
Fri 02/23 12:23 PM
Stipulation By T&T Air, LLC and Arnold & Itkin, LLP. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By T&T Air, LLC ) (Wyatt, Donald) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 01/31 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 01/31/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Adversary Order Setting Hearing
Mon 01/29 9:00 AM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 3/6/2018 at 02:15 PM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (DRJ). (aalo) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation
Wed 01/17 12:26 PM
Stipulation By Arnold & Itkin LLP and T&T Air, LLC. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? No. (Filed By Arnold & Itkin LLP ) (Chapple, Ryan) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation
Wed 12/13 12:41 PM
Stipulation By Arnold & Itkin LLP and T&T Air, LLC. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? No. (Filed By Arnold & Itkin LLP ) (Chapple, Ryan) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation
Wed 11/15 11:59 AM
Stipulation By Arnold & Itkin LLP and T&T Air, LLC. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? No. (Filed By Arnold & Itkin LLP ) (Chapple, Ryan) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation
Thu 10/12 10:56 AM
Stipulation By Arnold & Itkin LLP, T&T Air, LLC and T&T Air, LLC. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? No. (Filed By Arnold & Itkin LLP, T&T Air, LLC ) (Chapple, Ryan) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice
Thu 10/12 10:54 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service . Filed by Arnold & Itkin LLP (Chapple, Ryan) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 09/26 4:30 PM
Summons Service Executed on Arnold & Itkin LLP 9/21/2017. (Wyatt, Donald) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 09/21 12:06 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/20/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate
Tue 09/19 4:29 PM
Certificate of Service (Filed By T&T Air, LLC ) (Wyatt, Donald) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Mon 09/18 8:38 AM
Summons Issued as to Arnold & Itkin LLP Date Issued 9/18/2017. (jdav) |
|
Saturday, September 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary)
Sat 09/16 6:30 AM
|
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
court
Case Reassigned-Adversary
Fri 09/15 5:27 PM
Judge David R Jones added to case. Involvement of Judge Karen K. Brown Terminated. (than) |
||
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Thu 09/14 3:59 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Arnold & Itkin, LLP. (Wyatt, Donald) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Thu 09/14 3:56 PM
Adversary case 17-03396 Nature of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) Complaint by T&T Air, LLC against Arnold & Itkin LLP. Fee Amount $350 (Wyatt, Donald) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet |