Bell v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Mark E Ford |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-03078 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Sep 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 18, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
order
Judgment - SSA
Tue 09/18 9:11 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT AFFIRMING THE DECISION OF THE COMMISSIONER and Plaintiffs case is dismissed. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on September 18, 2018. (src) |
|
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
minutes
Social Security Hearing
Mon 09/17 5:00 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Mark E. Ford: Social Security Hearing held on 9/17/2018. (Debbie Maddox-Digital Recorder) (Proceedings held in Fort Smith-Room 226) (djm) |
|
Tuesday, June 05, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion to Waive
Tue 06/05 4:03 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting19 Motion to Waive. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on June 5, 2018. (djm) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Waive
Tue 06/05 9:03 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Waive Oral Argument by Lisa A. Bell. (Spencer, Frederick) |
|
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order Setting Social Security Hearing
Mon 06/04 10:06 AM
TEXT ONLY INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Counsel for government will be permitted to appear by telephone conference. Social Security Hearing set for 9/17/2018 10:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 2nd flr (Rm 226) before Honorable Mark E. Ford. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on June 4, 2018. (djm) |
|
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Appeal Brief (Social Security-Govt)
Fri 03/02 1:27 PM
APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Shah, Fatima) |
|
Wednesday, February 07, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Supplement
Wed 02/07 1:30 PM
SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Lisa A. Bell to15 Appeal Brief (Social Security-Plaintiff) . (Spencer, Frederick) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Appeal Brief (Social Security-Plaintiff)
Wed 02/07 1:29 PM
APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Lisa A. Bell. (Spencer, Frederick) |
|
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Social Security Scheduling Order - Oral Argument
Tue 01/09 9:34 AM
TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript. The brief must identify the specific points for appeal, provide references to the medical evidence supporting each point, and include page numbers for all medical evidence referenced in the brief. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. All briefs are limited to twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. All Social Security Appeal cases will be scheduled for oral argument once the briefs have been filed. A scheduling notice will be issued and the case placed on the calendar for oral argument as soon as can reasonably be permitted under Court policies, but not earlier than sixty (60) days following the filing of the appeal brief by the Social Security Commissioner. The scheduling order will indicate the date, time, and location of the oral argument. Any requests for continuance of the oral argument must be made by a formal motion. Video conferencing will be considered, if requested by formal motion, on a case by case basis, unless otherwise directed in the scheduling order. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 2/9/2018. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on January 9, 2018. (cla) |
|
order
Order Directing SSA Transcript Information - TEXT ONLY
Tue 01/09 9:35 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER directing the parties to identify the transcript page numbers of any duplicative and/or irrelevant medical records in their Social Security appeal briefs. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on January 9, 2018. (cla) |
||
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Social Security Transcript
Mon 01/08 4:17 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Groom, Deborah) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 01/08 4:07 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Shah, Fatima) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Affidavit of Service as to USA
Mon 12/04 2:03 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Lisa A. Bell. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 11/9/2017, answer due 1/8/2018.(Spencer, Frederick) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - service of Regional Chief, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - service of US Atty General, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - service of US Attorney | ||
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Tue 09/19 9:15 AM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (rg) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Requested as to USA
Mon 09/18 11:46 AM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to Regional Chief of SSA, US Attorney General and US Attorney for service of the following document: 1 Complaint. (Spencer, Frederick) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Consent/Reassignment - SSA
Mon 09/18 9:16 AM
CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Lisa A. Bell. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Spencer, Frederick) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Consent/Reassignment - SSA
Fri 09/15 4:23 PM
CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Lisa A. Bell. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Spencer, Frederick) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion for Service
Fri 09/15 4:00 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as after review it is found that Plaintiff is unable to pay for the costs of commencement of this suit ; granting3 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Social Security Administration Commissioner. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on September 15, 2017. (cla) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Magistrate Notice - SSA
Fri 09/15 11:10 AM
NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 9/29/2017.(tg) |
|
Att: 1 Consent/Reassignment Form | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis Service
Fri 09/15 10:50 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Lisa A. Bell. (tg) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 09/15 10:48 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Lisa A. Bell. (tg) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/15 10:46 AM
COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Lisa A. Bell.(tg) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B |