Lambert v. Tesla, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Vince Chhabria |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-05369 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:451 Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Sep 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 08, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 14, 2018 2:11 AM PDT |
Defendant
Tesla, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DeWitt Lambert
California Civil Rights Law Group 332 San Anselmo Avenue San Anselmo
San Anselmo, CA 94960 |
Represented By
|
GPO
Jan 08 2018
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION 13 AND DENYING MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 16 by Judge Vince Chhabria (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2018). |
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, July 22, 2019 | ||
45 | 45
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 07/22 10:12 AM
MANDATE of USCA (fabS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2019 | ||
44 | 44
appeal
USCA Order
Thu 07/11 9:01 AM
ORDER of USCA (fabS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
43 | 43
notice
Notice of Change In Counsel
Thu 05/23 1:21 PM
NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Danielle L. Ochs (Ochs, Danielle) |
|
Wednesday, May 22, 2019 | ||
42 | 42
appeal
USCA Order
Wed 05/22 8:33 AM
USCA OPINION. (fabS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, May 17, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
misc
Transcript Order
Thu 05/17 11:03 AM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/21/2017 before Judge Vince Chhabria by Tesla, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Black, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/17/2018) |
|
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Transcript
Thu 03/08 9:33 AM
Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 12/21/17, before Judge Vince Chhabria. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number 8584537590. Tape Number: FTR 10:08 - 10:32. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 3/29/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/9/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2018. (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2018) |
|
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Transcript Order
Fri 03/02 9:45 AM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/21/2017 before Judge Vince Chhabria by DeWitt Lambert, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/2/2018) |
|
38 | 38
appeal
Transcript Designation Form
Fri 03/02 9:43 AM
Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 12/21/2017 before Judge Vince Chhabria, (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/2/2018) |
|
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
appeal
USCA Case Number
Tue 02/13 12:17 PM
USCA Case Number 18-15203 9th Circuit for35 Notice of Appeal, filed by DeWitt Lambert. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2018) |
|
36 | 36
appeal
USCA Case Number
Tue 02/13 12:14 PM
ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED, DISREGARD - SEE DOC 37 USCA Case Number 18-15203 9th Circuit for35 Notice of Appeal, filed by DeWitt Lambert. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2018) Modified on 2/13/2018 (fabS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, February 07, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Wed 02/07 2:13 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by DeWitt Lambert. Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss33 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-12092347 paid.)(Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/7/2018) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Statement of Representation, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Dkt. No. 33 | ||
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief
Mon 01/08 4:39 PM
ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 15 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2018) |
|
33 | 33
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 01/08 4:35 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION 13 AND DENYING MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 16 by Judge Vince Chhabria (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2018) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
minutes
Motion Hearing
Thu 12/21 10:39 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Motion Hearing held on 12/21/2017 re 13 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Compel Arbitration filed by Tesla, Inc. The Court heard oral argument from the parties and takes the matter under submission. A written ruling will be issued. FTR Time: 10:08- 10:32. Plaintiff Attorney: Lawrence Organ and Noah Baron. Defendant Attorney: Danielle Ochs and Rachel Moroski. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/21/2017) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 12/20 4:56 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against All Defendants. Filed byDeWitt Lambert. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 12/20/2017) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
adr
ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held
Fri 12/15 3:44 PM
ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 12/15/2017 by Howard Herman. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled for 1/17/2018 at 2:00 PM. The call-in information remains the same. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) |
|
29 | 29
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Fri 12/15 11:55 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Moroski, Rachel) (Filed on 12/15/2017) |
|
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
4
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 12/08 9:59 AM
Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 26 Joint Stipulation to Continue December 19, 2017 Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 1/16/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2017) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Thu 12/07 2:37 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Plaintiff DeWitt Lambert (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 12/7/2017) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Thu 12/07 2:26 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 11 Clerk's Notice,, Joint Stipulation to Continue December 19, 2017 Case Management Conference filed by Tesla, Inc.. (Moroski, Rachel) (Filed on 12/7/2017) |
|
25 | 25
adr
ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference
Thu 12/07 12:25 PM
ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on December 15, 2017 at 3:00 PM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2017) |
|
24 | 24
adr
Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d)
Thu 12/07 12:11 PM
NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 12/7/2017) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Reply to Opposition/Response
Mon 12/04 7:31 PM
REPLY Reply filed byDeWitt Lambert. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 12/4/2017) |
|
22 | 22
adr
ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance
Mon 12/04 11:20 AM
ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2017) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Reply to Opposition/Response
Tue 11/28 12:22 PM
REPLY filed byImre S. Szalai. (Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 11/28/2017) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 11/28 12:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jahan C. Sagafi Counsel for Amicus Curiae Law Professor Imre S. Szalai (Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 11/28/2017) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Mon 11/27 6:16 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed byTesla, Inc.. (Ochs, Danielle) (Filed on 11/27/2017) |
|
18 | 18
oth_sup
Brief
Mon 11/27 6:09 PM
Brief re16 Opposition/Response to Motion,, Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to His Declaratory Judgment Act Claim filed byTesla, Inc.. (Ochs, Danielle) (Filed on 11/27/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Danielle Ochs, | ||
Att: 2 Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment A to Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 4 Attachment B to Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 5 Attachment C to Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 6 Attachment D to Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 7 Attachment E to Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 8 Attachment F to Request for Judicial Notice | ||
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Reply to Opposition/Response
Mon 11/20 4:49 PM
REPLY filed byTesla, Inc.. (Ochs, Danielle) (Filed on 11/20/2017) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Mon 11/13 8:07 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE and Plaintiff's Notice and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byDeWitt Lambert.(Avloni, Navruz) (Filed on 11/13/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Avloni Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Re: Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment | ||
15 | 15
motion
File Amicus Curiae Brief
Mon 11/13 5:55 PM
MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief of Law Professor Imre S. Szalai in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and in support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Compel Arbitration filed by DeWitt Lambert. Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2017 10:00 AM before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 11/27/2017. Replies due by 12/4/2017.(Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 11/13/2017) |
|
Att: 1 17 pgs Exhibit A - Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
oth_sup
Request for Judicial Notice
Mon 10/30 5:40 PM
Request for Judicial Notice re13 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Compel Arbitration filed byTesla, Inc.. (Ochs, Danielle) (Filed on 10/30/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment A, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment B, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment C, | ||
Att: 4 Attachment D, | ||
Att: 5 Attachment E, | ||
Att: 6 Attachment F, | ||
Att: 7 Attachment G | ||
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss
Mon 10/30 5:25 PM
MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Compel Arbitration filed by Tesla, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 11/13/2017. Replies due by 11/20/2017.(Ochs, Danielle) (Filed on 10/30/2017) |
|
Att: 1 21 pgs Memorandum of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Rachel J. Moroski | ||
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Wed 10/11 11:04 AM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint, to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1 filed by Tesla, Inc.. (Moroski, Rachel) (Filed on 10/11/2017) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Thu 09/28 1:13 PM
REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2017) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Tue 09/26 11:37 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DeWitt Lambert re9 Summons Issued Proof of Service (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/26/2017) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Fri 09/22 12:43 PM
Summons Issued as to Tesla, Inc.. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 09/21 11:28 AM
Proposed Summons. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/21/2017) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 09/21 11:01 AM
Proposed Summons. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/21/2017) |
|
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 09/21 8:37 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/21/2017.(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
5 | 5
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Thu 09/21 8:17 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2017) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
16
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/15 5:35 PM
COMPLAINT against Tesla, Inc. dba Tesla Motors, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11721975.). Filed byDeWitt Lambert.(Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/15/2017) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet |