Blackman v. Fox, et al
Original Case: 3:16-cv-01767
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-pr-02838 |
Type | prisoner / state / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 560 Prisoner Petitions - Civil Detainee - Conditions of Confinement |
Case Filed: | Sep 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 27, 2017 3:28 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
Stamford Hospital
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
City of Stamford, Connecticut
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Norwalk Hospital
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
City of Norwalk, Connecticut
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Gerald M. Fox, Probate Judge
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Todd Blackman
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/27/2017 3:24 AM EST |
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Todd Blackman in 17-2838 FILED. [2124285] 17-2838 17-2756 [Entered: 09/14/2017 10:46 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 08/24/2017, RECEIVED.[2124296] 17-2838 17-2756 [Entered: 09/14/2017 10:47 AM] | |
3 | 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2124297] 17-2838 17-2756 [Entered: 09/14/2017 10:48 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |