North American Elite Insurance Company v. Kingston Plumbing and Heating, Inc.
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | M Page Kelley |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-11760 |
Nature of Suit | 385 Torts - Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage |
Case Filed: | Sep 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 06, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 17, 2018 6:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Kingston Plumbing and Heating, Inc.
22 Robin Hill Road
Danvers, MA 01923 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
North American Elite Insurance Company
As subrogee of Nineteen Cooper Street Condo 650 Elm St
Manchester, NH 03101 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 10, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 04/10 3:42 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by Kingston Plumbing and Heating, Inc.. (Haverty, John) |
|
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
order
Settlement Order of Dismissal
Wed 03/06 5:37 PM
Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Belmont, Kellyann) |
|
28 | 28
adr
Report of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider
Wed 03/06 4:55 PM
REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider: Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal reports this case has settled. The clerk should enter a 30 day order of dismissal. (York, Steve) |
|
27 | 27
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Wed 03/06 4:45 PM
Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting26 Joint Motion to Cancel ADR Hearing to 03/06/19. (York, Steve) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Continue
Wed 03/06 4:14 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Cancel ADR Hearing to 03/06/19 by North American Elite Insurance Company.(Loftus, Patrick) |
|
Monday, March 04, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
minutes
Telephone Conference
Mon 03/04 4:48 PM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: Telephone Conference held on 3/4/2019. The Court reviewed preliminary matters with the parties prior to the upcoming mediation. (Court Reporter: SEALED Digital Recording) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, The parties should first seek leave of the Court. If approved, please then go to[LINK:http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm] . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. (Attorneys present: Cullen Jr. & Loftus for the plaintiff. Haverty for the defendant.) (York, Steve) |
|
Sunday, March 03, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Rescheduling
Sun 03/03 8:43 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULINGDue to the pending inclement weather, the Telephone Conference has been reset to March 4, 2019, at 2:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. Please use the same call in information that was previously provided to counsel. (York, Steve) |
|
Monday, January 07, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
minutes
Telephone Conference 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 01/07 3:52 PM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: Telephone Conference held on 1/7/2019.The Court reviewed preliminary matters with the parties prior to the upcoming mediation and addressed the parties joint submission requesting to continue the mediation. The Court granted the request and rescheduled the mediation for March 7, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. Telephone Conference will be held on March 4, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. Please review the earlier notice regarding rules and submissions prior to the mediation. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Cullen Jr. for the plaintiff. Haverty for the defendant.) (York, Steve) |
|
Friday, November 02, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 11/02 5:27 PM
NOTICE of Hearing.The Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing is set for January 10, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. Counsel and principals are directed to be present and have full settlement authority. Each party must submit a brief (no more than 5 pages) mediation memorandum that includes a discussion of (1) the merits of the case (both strengths and weaknesses); (2) damages or other relief sought by the parties; (3) the status of discovery; and (4) the status of the parties' settlement discussions. The memoranda should be submitted BY HAND, E-MAIL to (steve_york@mad.uscourts.gov), OR MAIL WITH THE COURT no later than five (5) business days prior to the mediation and marked "Confidential - Not for Docketing." In the event that any party believes that the case is not ripe for mediation, or the date poses a serious conflict, counsel are to notify opposing counsel and call the deputy clerk at 617-748-9238 as soon as possible. Prior to the mediation, there will be a Telephone Conference set for January 7, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. The clerk will provide the call in information to all parties by email, one day prior to the upcoming telephone conference. (York, Steve) |
|
Wednesday, October 31, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
utility
Notice of Assignment to ADR Provider
Wed 10/31 2:14 PM
Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge Jennifer C. Boal appointed.(Garvin, Brendan) |
|
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to ADR
Fri 10/26 11:46 AM
Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution.(Belmont, Kellyann) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order
Fri 10/26 10:47 AM
Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. In light of the Joint Status Report (#18), this case shall be referred for ADR with the mediation to be scheduled after the deposition of John Casamassima is completed. (MacDougall, Patricia) |
|
Friday, October 19, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Status Report
Fri 10/19 8:26 AM
STATUS REPORT by North American Elite Insurance Company. (Cullen, James) |
|
Wednesday, July 11, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
minutes
Status Conference 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 07/11 4:53 PM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: Status Conference held on 7/11/2018. Discovery is ongoing. After hearing from counsel the Court modifies the Amendments to Pleadings deadline to 9/28/2018. Counsel are to file a Joint Status Report by 10/5/2018. If counsel wish to have telephone conferences on discovery issues they may contact Kellyann Belmont. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to[LINK:http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm] . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.(Attorneys present: Patrick J. Loftus, III for the plainitff and John W. Haverty for the defendant) (Belmont, Kellyann) |
|
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 06/06 10:39 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 7/11/2018 02:30 PM in Courtroom 24 before Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Belmont, Kellyann) |
|
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
discov
Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26
Tue 01/30 9:57 AM
Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Kingston Plumbing and Heating, Inc..(Haverty, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Fire Report, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Invoice, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Policy | ||
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Mon 01/22 9:09 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Reassignment. Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley assigned to case. (Danieli, Chris) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Mon 01/22 8:53 AM
CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Kingston Plumbing and Heating, Inc., North American Elite Insurance Company.. (Paine, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 01/18 12:59 PM
Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered re11 JOINT STATEMENT is so ordered as modified as the case management scheduling order. DISCOVERY DUE November 30, 2018 and DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE November 1, 2018. (Paine, Matthew) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
discov
Joint submission pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
Fri 01/12 11:09 AM
JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by North American Elite Insurance Company.(Cullen, James) |
|
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Rescheduling
Tue 01/02 10:04 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference reset for 1/19/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Scheduling Conference
Thu 12/14 3:32 PM
NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 1/16/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 12/13 4:06 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Kingston Plumbing and Heating, Inc..(Haverty, John) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 11/28 4:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Haverty on behalf of Kingston Plumbing and Heating, Inc. (Haverty, John) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 11/06 3:03 PM
Reset Deadlines: Kingston Plumbing and Heating, Inc. Answer/Response Due 11/22/2017. (Paine, Matthew) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 11/06 9:21 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Kingston Plumbing and Heating, Inc. served on 11/1/2017, answer due 11/22/2017. (Loftus, Patrick) (Modified on 11/6/2017 to Correct Docket Text and Answer Deadline) (Paine, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 09/26 3:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Cullen, Jr on behalf of North American Elite Insurance Company (Cullen, James) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 09/18 11:45 AM
Summons Issued as to Kingston Plumbing and Heating, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Mon 09/18 11:44 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Coppola, Katelyn) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 09/18 9:44 AM
COMPLAINT against Kingston Plumbing and Heating, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6799447 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by North American Elite Insurance Company.(Loftus, Patrick) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/18/2017) (Coppola, Katelyn). (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/18/2017) (Paine, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Category Form |