Bamba v. Fenton, et al
Original Case: 2:15-cv-01340
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02870 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Sep 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 04, 2018 |
Last checked: Friday Dec 07, 2018 3:29 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
Kimberly Fenton
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Stony Brook University Hospital, AKA Suny at Stony Brook Hospital
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
N'Dama Miankanze Bamba
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/07/2018 3:29 AM EST |
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant N'Dama Miankanze Bamba, FILED. [2126037] 17-2870 [Entered: 09/15/2017 03:54 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 15 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 08/10/2017, RECEIVED.[2126055] 17-2870 [Entered: 09/15/2017 03:58 PM] | |
3 | 3 14 pgs PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant N'Dama Miankanze Bamba, district court receipt # 23568, FILED.[2126057] 17-2870 [Entered: 09/15/2017 03:58 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2126062] 17-2870 [Entered: 09/15/2017 03:59 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 14 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |