Connecticut District Court
Judge:Warren W Eginton
Case #: 3:17-cv-01567
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause9:9 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2017
Terminated:Oct 31, 2017
Last checked: Sunday Mar 18, 2018 4:44 AM EDT
Defendant
Glencore Intl AG
Defendant
ST Shipping & Transport Inc.
Represented By
Simon Irving Allentuch
Stockman O'Connor PLLC
contact info
Simon I. Allentuch
Neubert, Pepe & Monteith
contact info
Peter J. Behmke
Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle-Ny
contact info
Michael P. Jones
Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle-Ny
contact info
Anthony Charles Famiglietti
Neubert, Pepe & Monteith, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
ST Shipping & Transport PTE Ltd.
Represented By
Simon Irving Allentuch
Stockman O'Connor PLLC
contact info
Simon I. Allentuch
Neubert, Pepe & Monteith
contact info
Peter J. Behmke
Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle-Ny
contact info
Michael P. Jones
Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle-Ny
contact info
Anthony Charles Famiglietti
Neubert, Pepe & Monteith, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Space Shipping Ltd.
Represented By
Timothy J. Nast
Tisdale Law Offices LLC
contact info
Thomas L. Tisdale
Tisdale Law Offices LLC
contact info
John G. Kissane
Watson Farley & Williams LLP
contact info
Neil A. Quartaro
Watson Farley & Williams LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, October 31, 2017
28 28 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 10/31 4:12 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Glencore Int'l AG by ST Shipping & Transport Inc., ST Shipping & Transport PTE Ltd.. (Allentuch, Simon)
Related: [-]
notice Judicial Evaluation Program Survey Wed 11/01 9:51 AM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Fazekas, J.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2017
27 27 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 10/25 9:48 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ST Shipping & Transport PTE Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Glencore International A.G., Other Affiliate Glencore plc for ST Shipping & Transport PTE Ltd.. (Behmke, Peter)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 10/25 9:40 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ST Shipping & Transport Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Glencore International A.G. for ST Shipping & Transport Inc.. (Behmke, Peter)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/25 1:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Behmke on behalf of ST Shipping & Transport Inc., ST Shipping & Transport PTE Ltd. (Behmke, Peter)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 10/25 1:47 PM
CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Peter J. Behmke to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by ST Shipping & Transport Inc., ST Shipping & Transport PTE Ltd.. (Behmke, Peter)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/25 1:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Jones on behalf of ST Shipping & Transport Inc., ST Shipping & Transport PTE Ltd. (Jones, Michael)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 10/25 1:29 PM
CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael P. Jones to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by ST Shipping & Transport Inc., ST Shipping & Transport PTE Ltd.. (Jones, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2017
21 21 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/20 2:35 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Peter J. Behmke for ST Shipping & Transport Inc.,Peter J. Behmke for ST Shipping & Transport PTE Ltd. added. Certificate of Good Standing due by 12/19/2017. Signed by Clerk on 10/20/2017. (Gould, K.)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/20 2:32 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 12/19/2017. Signed by Clerk on 10/20/2017. (Gould, K.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2017
19 19 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Thu 10/19 5:48 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by ST Shipping & Transport Inc., ST Shipping & Transport PTE Ltd..Responses due by 11/9/2017(Allentuch, Simon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Affidavit of Edward Henry Mills-Webb
misc Filing Fee Received Thu 10/19 10:31 AM
Filing fee for Motion for Admission Pro Hav Vice of Michael P. Jones received from Neubert, Pepe and Monteith PC: $ 75.00, receipt number CTXN00015900 (Potter, A.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2017
18 18 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/19 10:42 AM
MOTION for Attorney(s) Peter J. Behmke to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by ST Shipping & Transport Inc., ST Shipping & Transport PTE Ltd. Fee paid, receipt# CTXN00015901.(Potter, A.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
17 17 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/19 10:04 AM
MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael P. Jones to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by ST Shipping & Transport Inc., ST Shipping & Transport PTE Ltd..(Potter, A.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/18 2:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Charles Famiglietti on behalf of ST Shipping & Transport Inc., ST Shipping & Transport PTE Ltd. (Famiglietti, Anthony)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/18 2:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Simon I. Allentuch on behalf of ST Shipping & Transport Inc., ST Shipping & Transport PTE Ltd. (Allentuch, Simon)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2017
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 10/16 5:30 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Space Shipping Ltd.. All Defendants. (Nast, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2017
13 13 misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 09/28 2:16 PM
CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re3 MOTION for Attorney(s) Neil A. Quartaro, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4538750) by Space Shipping Ltd.. (Quartaro, Neil)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2017
12 12 misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 09/25 5:17 PM
CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re8 MOTION for Attorney(s) John Kissane to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4540361) by Space Shipping Ltd.. (Kissane, John)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/25 5:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John G. Kissane on behalf of Space Shipping Ltd. (Kissane, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2017
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 09/21 4:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Space Shipping Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Geden Holdings, Ltd. for Space Shipping Ltd.. (Tisdale, Thomas)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 09/21 9:08 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John Kissane. Certificate of Good Standing due by 11/20/2017. Signed by Clerk on 9/21/2017. (Fazekas, J.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2017
8 8 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 09/20 5:18 PM
MOTION for Attorney(s) John Kissane to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4540361) by Space Shipping Ltd..(Nast, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
7 7 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 09/20 12:47 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Neil A. Quartaro for Space Shipping Ltd. added. Certificate of Good Standing due by 11/19/2017. Signed by Clerk on 9/20/2017. (Fazekas, J.)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 09/20 12:39 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Glencore Intl AG, ST Shipping & Transport Inc., ST Shipping & Transport PTE Ltd. * with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Timothy J. Nast* *Tisdale Law Offices LLC* *10 Spruce St.* *Southport, CT 06890*. (Fazekas, J.)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Electronic Service Documents Wed 09/20 12:37 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-representing parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of1 Complaint (Petition to Confirm Arbitrtion Award, filed by Space Shipping Ltd.,4 Electronic Filing Order,3 MOTION for Attorney(s) Neil A. Quartaro, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4538750) filed by Space Shipping Ltd.,2 Affidavit,, filed by Space Shipping Ltd. Signed by Clerk on 9/19/2017.(Fazekas, J.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2017
4 4 order Electronic Filing Order Wed 09/20 12:34 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 9/19/2017.(Fazekas, J.)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/19 6:28 PM
MOTION for Attorney(s) Neil A. Quartaro, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4538750) by Space Shipping Ltd..(Nast, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of Neil Quartaro
2 2 misc Affidavit Tue 09/19 6:12 PM
AFFIDAVIT re1 Complaint, [Declaration] Signed By Neil A. Quartaro filed by Space Shipping Ltd..(Nast, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16,
Att: 17 Exhibit 17,
Att: 18 Exhibit 18,
Att: 19 Exhibit 19,
Att: 20 Exhibit 20,
Att: 21 Exhibit 21,
Att: 22 Exhibit 22,
Att: 23 Exhibit 23,
Att: 24 Exhibit 24,
Att: 25 Exhibit 25,
Att: 26 Exhibit 26,
Att: 27 Exhibit 27,
Att: 28 Exhibit 28,
Att: 29 Exhibit 29,
Att: 30 Exhibit 30
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 09/19 6:00 PM
COMPLAINT [Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award] against Glencore International AG, ST Shipping & Transport Inc., ST Shipping & Transport PTE Ltd. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-4538727.), filed by Space Shipping Ltd..(Nast, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
service Request to Issue Summons Tue 09/19 6:14 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Glencore International AG, ST Shipping & Transport Inc., ST Shipping & Transport PTE Ltd.. (Nast, Timothy)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 09/20 10:45 AM
Judge Warren W. Eginton added. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]