SANDS v. STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph F Leeson, Jr |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-04160 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Sep 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 30, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 18, 2018 4:23 AM EDT |
Defendant
STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BARBARA SANDS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 35 minutes ago |
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case - 41(b)
Wed 05/30 2:36 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b) SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. ON MAY 30, 2018. 5/30/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(dja, ) |
|
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 05/01 3:38 PM
ORDER THAT MATRICIA MCLAUGHLIN, ESQ., FORMERLY APPOINTED AS AN ARBITRATOR FOR THE ARBITRATION HEARING ON 6/05/2018 AT 9:30 AM IS REPLACED. FURTHERMORE, IT IS ORDERED THAT MARLA J. MELMAN, ESQ., IS APPOINTED TO SERVE AS AN ARBITRATOR IN THIS CASE ON THE DATE AND TIME NOTED ABOVE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 4/24/2018. 5/1/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf) |
|
Monday, April 30, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
minutes
Settlement Conference
Mon 04/30 3:31 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN re: An In Person Settlement Conference was held on 4/30/18. (ky, ) |
|
Monday, April 23, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice of Hearing
Mon 04/23 10:17 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: ARBITRATION HEARING RESCHEDULED FOR 6/5/2018 09:30 AM IN Allentown.(ahf) |
|
Friday, April 20, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/20 4:24 PM
ORDER THAT THE ARBITRATION SCHEDULED FOR MAY 15, 2018 IS CONTINUED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL RESCHEDULE THE MATTER FOR ARBITRATION ON OR AFTER MAY 30, 2018. THE FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 5/29/18, AND THE TRIAL SCHEDULED TO BEGIN JUNE 4, 2018, PER THIS COURT'S ORDER OF NOVEMBER 30, 2017 ARE CANCELLED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 4/20/18. 4/20/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FORWARDED TO ARBITRATION CLERK.(ky, ) |
|
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Arbitration
Wed 04/11 2:07 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ARBITRATION AND APPOINTING JEFFRREY MARC POLLOCK, ESQ., MATRICIA MCLAUGHLIN, ESQ., AND WILLIAM K. MALKAES, ESQ., AS ARBITRATORS ON 5/15/2018 AT 9:30 AM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 4/9/2018. 4/11/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
Fri 04/06 11:18 AM
OPINION/ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ECF NO. 22, IS GRANTED. JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF ON COUNT II - BAD FAITH OF DEFENDANT, STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 4/5/18. 4/6/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, ) |
|
33 | 33
15
pgs
order
Memorandum and/or Opinion
Fri 04/06 11:14 AM
MEMORANDUM/OPINION THAT PLAINTIFF SANDS CANNOT PREVAIL ON HER BAD FAITH CLAIMS, AND STATE FARM'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. A SEPARATE ORDER WILL ISSUE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 4/5/18. 4/6/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, ) |
|
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 04/03 9:03 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: ARBITRATION HEARING RESCHEDULED FOR 5/15/2018 09:30 AM IN Allentown.(ahf) |
|
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Praecipe/Request
Mon 04/02 4:58 PM
Request for Oral Argument as to Defedant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by BARBARA SANDS. (ZENSTEIN, JOSEPH) |
|
30 | 30
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 04/02 4:15 PM
PLAINTIFF'S SUR-REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY BARBARA SANDS. (ky, ) |
|
29 | 29
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Mon 04/02 4:09 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUR-REPLY IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL DOCKET EXHIBIT A TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUR-REPLY AS PLAINTIFF'S SUR-REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. THE ORDER DATED 3/29/28, ECF NO. 28, IS VACATED. THE ARBITRATION TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 5/1/18 IS CONTINUED AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL RESCHEDULE THE ARBITRATION TRIAL FOR ON OR AFTER 5/11/18. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 4/2/18. 4/2/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FORWARDED TO ARBITRATION CLERK.(ky, ) |
|
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Arbitration
Thu 03/29 4:01 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ARBITRATION AND APPOINTING JEFFREY MARC POLLOCK, MATRICIA MCLAUGHLIN, AND WILLIAM K. MALKAMES AS ARBITRATORS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 3/29/18. 3/29/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FORWARDED TO ARBITRATION CLERK.(ky, ) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Leave to File Document
Thu 03/29 3:13 PM
MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply to Defendants Reply filed by BARBARA SANDS.Certificate of Service.(ZENSTEIN, JOSEPH) |
|
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 03/23 11:55 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re22 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Reply to Plaintiff's Counter Statement of Undisputed Facts filed by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (DESIPIO, YOLANDA) |
|
25 | 25
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 03/23 7:02 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re22 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY.(DESIPIO, YOLANDA) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit | ||
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 03/16 4:46 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re22 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by BARBARA SANDS.(FEINSTEIN, STEVEN) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit M, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit N, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit Exhibit O, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit Exhibit P, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit Exhibit Q, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit Exhibit R | ||
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 02/27 4:30 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR RECONSIDERATION IS DENIED, AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ECF NO. 22, IS ACCEPTED FOR CONSIDERATION.SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 2/26/18. 2/27/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, ) |
|
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Summary Partial Judgment
Fri 02/23 3:50 PM
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY.Brief, Certificate of Service.(DESIPIO, YOLANDA) |
|
Att: 1 Order, | ||
Att: 2 Brief, | ||
Att: 3 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 02/22 11:30 AM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S LETTER REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF THE DEADLINE FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS IN LIGHT OF A PENDING DEPOSITION IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 2/21/18. 2/22/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, ) |
|
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 01/30 12:05 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 5/1/2018 09:30 AM IN Allentown.(ahf) |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines
Fri 01/26 1:39 PM
ORDER THAT THE REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION IS GRANTED AND THE PARTIES SHALL FILE ANY DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 19, 2018. THE ARBITRATION HEARING TENTATIVELY SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 5, 2018, IS CONTINUED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SCHEDULE THIS MATTER FOR AN ARBITRATION TRIAL ON OR AFTER MAY 1, 2018, TO BE HELD IN ALLENTOWN, PENNSYLVANIA. ALL OTHER DEADLINES REMAIN IN EFFECT.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 1/24/18. 1/26/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, ) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 01/17 4:59 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN re: A Telephonic Settlement Conference was held on 1/12/18. (ky, ) |
|
17 | 17
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 01/17 4:55 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN re: A Telephonic Settlement Conference was held on 1/17/18. (ky, ) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
minutes
Settlement Conference
Tue 12/19 3:47 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN re: A Telephonic Settlement Conference was held on 12/19/17. (ky, ) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 11/22 10:48 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 4/5/2018 09:30 AM IN Allentown.(ahf) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
3
pgs
order
Order
Wed 11/22 9:29 AM
ORDER THAT AN IN PERSON SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 4/30/18 AT 9:30 A.M. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 11/21/17. 11/22/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, ) |
|
13 | 13
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 11/21 4:55 PM
ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT/STATUS CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 12/19/2017 AT 2:30 P.M. BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 11/21/17. 11/21/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ky, ) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement
Tue 11/21 9:14 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN TO SCHEDULE AND CONDUCT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 11/17/17. 11/21/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, ) |
|
11 | 11
9
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Arbitration ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 11/20 3:08 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE FOR AN ARBITRATION TRIAL ON OR AFTER 4/5/18. DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 1/25/2018; MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 1/25/2018; A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 5/29/2018 AT 4:00 P.M.; AND JURY SELECTION IS SCHEDULED FOR 6/4/2018 AT 9:00 A.M. IN PHILADELPHIA, PA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 11/17/17. 11/20/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FORWARDED TO ARBITRATION CLERK. (ky, ) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Thu 11/16 4:42 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR re: A Pretrial Conference was held on 11/16/17. (ky, ) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 11/16 2:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN C. FEINSTEIN on behalf of BARBARA SANDS (FEINSTEIN, STEVEN) |
|
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 10/24 2:41 PM
NOTICE OF SCHEDULING OF INITIAL FED.R.CIV.P. 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: AN INITIAL FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR THURSDAY, NOVEMBER 16, 2017, AT 2:30 P.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. AT THE EDWARD N. CAHN U.S. COURTHOUSE AND FEDERAL BUILDING, COURTROOM C, THIRD FLOOR, 504 WEST HAMILTON STREET, ALLENTOWN, PENNSYLVANIA.(dja, ) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
State Court Record
Mon 10/23 9:20 AM
Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (fdc, ) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 10/11 9:32 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Paul Merlino re: served Subpoena to Produce Documents upon Apex Claim Adjusters by Personal on 10/05/17 (DESIPIO, YOLANDA) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 09/26 11:35 AM
ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY.(DESIPIO, YOLANDA) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 09/21 2:58 PM
INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER THAT GOVERNS THE CASE AND CONTAINS RULES OF PRACTICE THAT MUST BE FOLLOWED IN ADDITION TO THIS DISTRICT'S LOCAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 9/21/17. 9/21/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, ) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Jury Demand
Thu 09/21 9:50 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by BARBARA SANDS. (ZENSTEIN, JOSEPH) |
|
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 (COURT ONLY)
Tue 09/19 1:42 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY.(ahf) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 09/19 1:40 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY from Philadelphia CCP, case number 170602074.(Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 165847). Certificate of Service..(ahf) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheets | ||
misc
Jury Demand
Tue 09/19 1:45 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (ahf) |