Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:16-bk-60070

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:David R Jones
Case #: 6:17-ap-06015
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2017
Terminated:Feb 28, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Teletrac, Inc.
1999 Bryan Street Suite 900
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
Teletrac, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael B. Schmidt
401 Grant Place
Corpus Christi, TX 78411
Represented By
Michael B. Schmidt
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Saturday, March 03, 2018
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 03/04 12:00 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/03/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, February 28, 2018
9 9 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 03/01 11:23 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary 6:17-ap-6015 Related [+] Signed on 2/28/2018. (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-] 8
Wednesday, January 10, 2018
8 8 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 01/10 9:38 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Michael B. Schmidt (Chapman, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, December 04, 2017
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/04 4:18 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Teletrac, Inc. (Kane, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, September 27, 2017
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 09/27 2:20 PM
Summons Service Executed on Teletrac, Inc. 9/25/2017. (Chapman, Richard)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 24, 2017
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 09/24 11:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/24/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings
Friday, September 22, 2017
4 4 court Summons Issued Fri 09/22 2:24 PM
Summons Issued on Teletrac, Inc. Date Issued 9/22/2017. (wbos)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary) Fri 09/22 6:30 AM
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2017
2 2 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Thu 09/21 9:33 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons on TELETRAC, INC.. (Chapman, Richard)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Thu 09/21 9:28 AM
Adversary case 17-06015 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Complaint to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers by Michael B. Schmidt against Teletrac, Inc.. Fee waived due to lack of funds in the estate. (Chapman, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A