Hubbell v. Lacy Katzen LLP
New York Western District Court | |
Judge: | John T Curtin |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-00031 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 14, 2014 |
Terminated: | May 29, 2014 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 06, 2014 1:53 PM EST |
Defendant
Lacy Katzen LLP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Hubbell
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 29, 2014 | ||
14 | 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Richard Hubbell (Andrews, Seth) | |
Friday, May 02, 2014 | ||
13 | 13 TEXT ORDER: The12 Stipulation filed by the parties is hereby APPROVED. Therefore, Defense Counsel may have until 5/31/2014 to answer or otherwise move with respect to Plaintiff's Complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. John T. Curtin on 5/2/2014. (JEC) | |
Wednesday, April 30, 2014 | ||
12 | 12 STIPULATION re1 Complaint Extending Defendant's Time to Appear, Answer or Move Against the Complaint by Lacy Katzen LLP. | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, March 28, 2014 | ||
11 | 11 STIPULATION re1 Complaint Extending Defendant's Time to Appear, Answer or Move Against the Complaint by Lacy Katzen LLP. | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, March 03, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 TEXT ORDER: The9 Stipulation extending the time for Defendant to answer or otherwise move until 3/31/2014 is hereby APPROVED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. John T. Curtin on 3/3/2014. (JEC) | |
Friday, February 28, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 STIPULATION re1 Complaint Extending Defendant's Time to Appear, Answer or Move Against the Complaint by Lacy Katzen LLP. | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, February 10, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 TEXT ORDER: The6 Stipulation extending the time for Defendant to answer or otherwise move until 2/28/2014 is hereby APPROVED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. John T. Curtin on 2/10/2014. (JEC) | |
7 | 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Refermat on behalf of Lacy Katzen LLP | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
6 | 6 STIPULATION re1 Complaint Extending Defendant's Time to Appear, Answer or Move by Lacy Katzen LLP. | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, January 28, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Hubbell. Lacy Katzen LLP served on 1/21/2014, answer due 2/11/2014. (Andrews, Seth) | |
Wednesday, January 15, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 Summons Issued as to Lacy Katzen LLP. (SG) | |
3 | 3 Consent to Magistrate Judge forms electronically forwarded to attorney. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening (SG) | |
2 | 2 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation; ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorney (SG) | |
Case assigned to Hon. John T. Curtin. (SG) | ||
Tuesday, January 14, 2014 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Lacy Katzen LLP ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-1951889.), filed by Richard Hubbell.(Andrews, Seth) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |