College Park Investments, LLC
Maryland Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Thomas J Catliota |
Case #: | 0:17-bk-22678 |
Case Filed: | Sep 22, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Oct 30, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | Jan 29, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 24, 2021 |
Plan Confirmed: | Oct 24, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
College Park Investments, LLC
7302 Yale Ave
College Park, MD 20740-3329 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee - Greenbelt
6305 Ivy Lane, Suite 600
Greenbelt, MD 20770 |
Docket last updated: 09/21/2017 8:00 PM EDT |
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
court
Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Fri 09/22 10:30 AM
Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) |
||
1 | 1
4
pgs
misc
VOLUNTARY Petition (Chapter 11)
Fri 09/22 10:10 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by College Park Investments, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Exclusivity expires 01/22/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 03/21/2018. (Katz, Lawrence) |
|
Att: 1 Unanimous Written Consent to Bankruptcy Filing | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs Affidavit Re: Top Twenty Unsecured Creditors | ||
Att: 3 3 pgs List of 20 Largest Creditors | ||
Att: 4 Affidavit Re: Creditor Matrix | ||
Att: 5 List of All Creditors | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Fri 09/22 10:12 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-22678 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 31349542. Fee amount 1717.00 (U.S. Treasury) |