Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02734

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:17-cv-00702
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2017
Terminated:Feb 24, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 21, 2018 5:11 AM EDT
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS QUIBB COMPANY
Represented By
THOMAS LARRY HILL
Moore Hill & Westmoreland Pa - Pensacola
contact info
Defendant
OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Defendant
OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Plaintiff
BRIANNA R BUKOVINSKY
Represented By
AARON RUSSELL DIAS
Richardson Patrick Westbrook Etc - Mt Pleasant Sc
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, October 13, 2017
4 4 4 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/13 2:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS LARRY HILL on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS QUIBB COMPANY (HILL, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2017
3 3 2 pgs service Summons Issued Mon 09/25 8:15 AM
Summons Issued as to BRISTOL-MYERS QUIBB COMPANY, #1 OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, #2 OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (djb)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Docket Annotation Mon 09/25 8:06 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: NOTE to filer - The parties were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names shall be formatted using all capital letters and no punctuation unless the punctuation is part of the name. Descriptors such as A or THE (i.e. Mr or Mrs) should be omitted. More information about formatting may be found on the FLND Internet. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/22 2:39 PM
COMPLAINT and jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-3981640.), filed by Brianna R. Bukovinsky. (DIAS, AARON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit Summons for Bristol-Myers Squibb Co.,
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit Summons for Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc.,
Att: 4 2 pgs Exhibit Summons for Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 09/25 8:01 AM
CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR and SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON no longer assigned to case. (djb)
Related: [-]