Davitz v. Ohio Christian University et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | James L Graham |
Referred: | Kimberly A Jolson |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00839 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:451 Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Sep 22, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 21, 2018 5:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
Rick Christman
Trevecca Nazarene University 333 Murfreesboro Road
Nashville, OH 37210 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Probation Officer Tom Griffin
Ohio Christian University 1476 Lancaster Pike
CIrcleville, OH 43113 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rob Hartman
Ohio Christian University 7435 Monticello Rd.
Columbia, SC 29203 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Common Pleas Judge Mike Holbrook
Ohio Christian University 1476 Lancaster Pike
CIrcleville, OH 43113 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ohio Christian University
1476 Lancaster Pike
Circleville, OH 44113 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Frank Skies
Ohio Christian University 1476 Lancaster Pike
CIrcleville, OH 43113 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mark A Smith
Columbia International University 7435 Monticello Rd.
Columbia, SC 29203 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gary Uber
Ohio Christian University 1476 Lancaster Pike
Circleville, OH 43113 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeremy D. Davitz
|
Represented By
|
1. | Lawsuit charges Ohio Christian University fired its lawyer for investigating allegations of misconduct by president's son (insidehighered.com) |
Submitted Thu 05/03/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, October 01, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff Jeremy D. Davitz. (Oliver, Jami) |
|
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
![]() ORDER dismissing14 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; dismissing19 Motion to Dismiss; dismissing27 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 9/17/2018. (ds) |
|
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
![]() ORDER: This case has been reported settled. Status Conference set for 11/29/2018 at 10:00 AM in Teleconference unless the dismissal entry is received prior to that time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/14/2018. (ew) |
|
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
![]() ORDER granting36 Motion to Modify Case Schedule: Discovery due by 2/28/2019. Dispositive motions due by 3/28/2019. Primary Expert due by 1/15/2019. Rebuttal Expert due by 2/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/6/2018. (ew) |
|
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
![]() Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 2/18/2019. AGREED MOTION TO MODIFY CASE SCHEDULE AS SET FORTH IN MEMORANDUM OF FIRST PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FILED JANUARY 3, 2018 by Plaintiff Jeremy D. Davitz. (Oliver, Jami) |
|
Thursday, August 16, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
![]() Notice of Mediation Conference: Mediator James D. Abrams to conduct Settlement Week Conference on 9/12/2018 at 09:00 AM. (jr) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, August 15, 2018 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 08/15 11:43 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson: Status Conference held on 8/15/2018. (jr) |
||
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Mon 08/06 9:53 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/15/2018 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr) |
||
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
![]() ORDER: This case has been previously identified as ready for mediation during the Court's September Settlement Week. Counsel are ORDERED to confer re the readiness of their case for Settlement Week and contact Courtroom Deputy Jessica Rector by 8/10/2018 to advise her if the case should not be set. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/3/2018. (ew) |
|
Wednesday, August 01, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
![]() NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/14/2019 @9:00 AM in Room #243 before Judge James L. Graham. Jury Trial set for 7/15/2019 @9:00 AM in Courtroom 5 - Columbus before Judge James L. Graham. (ds) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
![]() AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/2/2018. (ew) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re27 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Jeremy D. Davitz. (Oliver, Jami) |
|
30 | 30
![]() NOTICE by Defendant Mark A Smith Initial Disclosures (Kmetz, Kimberlee) |
|
29 | 29
![]() NOTICE by Defendants Rick Christman, Rob Hartman of Initial Disclosures (Kolman, Michael) |
|
Monday, January 15, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
![]() REPLY to Response to Motion re19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Rick Christman, Rob Hartman. (Kolman, Michael) |
|
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
![]() MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Mark A Smith. (Kmetz, Kimberlee) |
|
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
![]() REPLY to Response to Motion re14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial) filed by Defendants Tom Griffin, Mike Holbrook, Ohio Christian University, Frank Skies, Gary Uber. (Curley, William) |
|
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
![]() MEMORANDUM OF FIRST PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case is referred to the September 2018 SETTLEMENT WEEK. Joinder of Parties and Motions to Amend due by 3/2/2018. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 1/31/2018. Primary Expert due by 10/1/2018. Rebuttal Expert due by 1/15/2018. Discovery due by 1/15/2018. Dispositive motions due by 12/21/2018. Settlement Demand due by 2/3/2018; Response due within 30 days of receipt of Settlement Demand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/3/2018. (ew) |
|
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Jeremy D. Davitz. (Oliver, Jami) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
![]() RULE 26(f) REPORT of Parties by Defendants Tom Griffin, Mike Holbrook, Ohio Christian University, Frank Skies, Gary Uber. (Curley, William) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
![]() ORDER granting21 Motion for Extension of Time: Reply to14 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings due by 1/8/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/19/2017. (ew) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial) New date requested 1/8/2018. by Defendants Tom Griffin, Mike Holbrook, Ohio Christian University, Frank Skies, Gary Uber. (Curley, William) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial) filed by Plaintiff Jeremy D. Davitz. (Oliver, Jami) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
![]() MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Rick Christman, Rob Hartman. (Kolman, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 12/05 11:01 AM
For good cause shown, Defendant Mark A. Smith's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Move or Plead is GRANTED. (Doc. 16). Consequently, Defendant shall move, plead, or otherwise respond to the Complaint by January 11, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/15/2017. (KAJ) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
![]() STIPULATION of Service by Defendant Mark A Smith. (Kmetz, Kimberlee) |
|
16 | 16
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 1/11/2018. by Defendant Mark A Smith. (Kmetz, Kimberlee) |
|
15 | 15
![]() NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/3/2018 @ 1:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
![]() MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial) by Defendants Tom Griffin, Mike Holbrook, Ohio Christian University, Frank Skies, Gary Uber. (Curley, William) |
|
13 | 13
![]() ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Tom Griffin, Mike Holbrook, Ohio Christian University, Frank Skies, Gary Uber. (Curley, William) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberlee J. Kmetz for Defendant Mark A Smith (Kmetz, Kimberlee) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher E Hogan for Defendants Rick Christman, Rob Hartman (Hogan, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Rick Christman on 10/12/2017, answer due 12/11/2017; Rob Hartman on 10/12/2017, answer due 12/11/2017. (Oliver, Jami) |
|
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Sabin Kolman for Defendants Rick Christman, Rob Hartman (Kolman, Michael) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Gary Uber on 9/25/2017, answer due 11/24/2017. (Curley, William) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Ohio Christian University on 9/25/2017, answer due 11/24/2017. (Curley, William) |
|
6 | 6
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Tom Griffin on 9/25/2017, answer due 11/24/2017. (Curley, William) |
|
5 | 5
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Mike Holbrook on 9/25/2017, answer due 11/24/2017. (Curley, William) |
|
4 | 4
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Frank Skies on 9/25/2017, answer due 11/24/2017. (Curley, William) |
|
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlin L Madigan for Defendants Tom Griffin, Mike Holbrook, Ohio Christian University, Frank Skies, Gary Uber (Madigan, Kaitlin) |
|
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by William Charles Curley for Defendants Tom Griffin, Mike Holbrook, Ohio Christian University, Frank Skies, Gary Uber (Curley, William) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6134410), filed by Jeremy D. Davitz. (Oliver, Jami) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |