Renee MacLaughlan Bozarth v. Envision Healthcare Corporation et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando M Olguin |
Referred: | Shashi H Kewalramani |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-01935 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Sep 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 30, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 21, 2018 1:40 AM PDT |
Defendant
EDS-I Practitioners of California
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
EmCare Holdings, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Envision Healthcare Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Renee MacLaughlan Bozarth
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield
Terminated: 11/11/2017
|
|
Defendant
Anthem, Inc.
Terminated: 11/11/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Blue Cross of California
Terminated: 11/11/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, June 30, 2020 | ||
106 | 106
judgmentCV
Judgment
Tue 06/30 4:53 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Plaintiffs Renee MacLaughlan Bozarth and Stella Bell shall be paid a service payment of $2,500 and $1,250, respectively, in accordance with the terms of the Settlement Agreement and the Order. Class counsel shall be paid $1,850,000 in attorney's fees and costs in accordance with the terms of the Settlement Agreement and the Order. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (iv) |
|
105 | 105
order
Attorney Fees Settlement
Tue 06/30 1:27 PM
ORDER RE: FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Certification of Settlement Class98 is granted. Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Awards to Representative Plaintiffs95 is granted. (iv) |
|
Tuesday, June 23, 2020 | ||
104 | 104
respm
Declaration (Motion related)
Tue 06/23 7:09 AM
DECLARATION of Jason M. Stinehart, Rust Consulting, Inc., Amended Declaration of Settlement Administrator in support of final approval of class action settlement, attesting to the Claims Administrator's compliance with the Notice Program and distribution of notice to the class, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Certification of Settlement Class 98 filed by Plaintiffs Stella Bell, Renee MacLaughlan Bozarth. (Waldman, Chet) |