Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 3:17-cr-00429
Case Filed:Aug 25, 2017
Terminated:Aug 25, 2017
Last checked: Monday Nov 20, 2017 8:02 AM CST
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Lekeebrion D Jackson (1)
Terminated: 08/25/2017


Friday, August 25, 2017
1 1 ORDER TRANSFERRING PROBATION/SUPERVISED RELEASE JURISDICTION as to Lekeebrion D Jackson pursuant to 18 USC 3605 TO the U.S. District Court, Dallas Division FROM Southern District of Iowa, Davenport Division upon order accepting jurisdiction. Case number in other district: 3:09-cr-120. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 8/25/2017) (aaa)
Related: [-]
2 2 TRANSFER OF JURISDICTION for Supervision of Probationer/Supervised Releasee Lekeebrion D Jackson. (aaa)
Related: [-]