U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Otto Candies, L.L.C.
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lance M Africk |
Referred: | Daniel E Knowles, III |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-09584 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:12117 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 25, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 27, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 24, 2018 4:13 AM CDT |
Defendant
Otto Candies, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
17
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment
Thu 08/23 10:04 AM
ORDER granting22 Motion to Approve Consent Decree. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 8/23/2018. (blg) |
|
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Wed 08/22 8:46 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re22 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment /Decree . **Filing attorney did not select Otton Candies L.L.C., as a filer. Clerk added filer.** (sbs) |
|
Tuesday, August 21, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Approve Consent Judgment
Tue 08/21 10:36 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment /Decree by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.(Kingsley, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, June 27, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 06/27 12:04 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lance M Africk: Telephone Status Conference held on 6/27/2018. (blg) |
|
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 06/27 10:37 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 6/27/2018.(blg) |
|
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 06/27 10:36 AM
This Court has been advised that the case has settled. Counsel are thanked for their assistance. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 6/27/2018.(blg) |
|
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
minutes
Status Conference Set Hearings
Wed 05/30 2:19 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lance M Africk: Telephone Status Conference held on 5/30/2018. ORDERED: follow-up Status Conference set for 6/27/2018 08:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. (blg) |
|
Tuesday, May 22, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 05/22 4:06 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that, prior to filing a motion for summary judgment, counsel shall schedule and appear for a status conference before this Court, at which time the motion will be discussed by all parties. Notwithstanding such conference, he dispositive motions deadline set forth by Judge Engelhardt remains intact. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 5/22/2018.(jls) |
|
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order Set Hearings
Tue 05/22 1:44 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that a status conference in the above-captioned matter is set for 5/30/2018 at 8:30 A.M. Counsel may participate by telephone, provided they furnish the Court with the number at which they prefer to be reached prior to the conference. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 5/22/2018.(jls) |
|
Wednesday, May 16, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 05/18 11:03 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lance M Africk. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 5/16/2018.(blg) |
|
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Fri 03/16 1:56 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Substitute Attorney Sarah Elaine Stephens in place of Attorney Alyse Susanne Richard for Otto Candies, L.L.C.. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 3/15/2018. (cbs) |
|
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Substitute Attorney
Wed 03/14 4:26 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Sarah E. Stephens to be substituted in place of Alyse S. Richard by Otto Candies, L.L.C..(David, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 02/28 11:54 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/29/2018 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt. Jury Trial set for 12/10/2018 08:30 AM before Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt. All discovery must be completed by 10/11/2018, as stated within document. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 2/28/2018. (NEF: MAG-3)(cbs) |
|
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice Form | ||
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Statement of Corporate Disclosure
Mon 02/26 2:39 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Otto Candies, L.L.C. (David, Robert) |
|
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 02/15 12:46 PM
NOTICE - Scheduling Conference set for 2/27/2018 09:30 AM before case manager, by telephone. (cbs) |
|
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay Order on Motion to Withdraw
Thu 01/25 3:01 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion to Withdraw re7 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 1/24/2018. (sa) |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Withdraw Document
Tue 01/23 4:13 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Ex Parte MOTION to Withdraw Document re7 Consent MOTION to Stay This Action and Extend Deadlines by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.(Kingsley, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Stay
Mon 01/22 7:31 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Consent MOTION to Stay This Action and Extend Deadlines by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.(Kingsley, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 11/27 4:23 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Otto Candies, L.L.C..Attorney Robert J. David, Jr added to party Otto Candies, L.L.C.(pty:dft).(David, Robert) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record
Fri 10/20 12:25 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion to Enroll Attorney Michelle T. Butler as Additional Counsel of Record for U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 10/19/2017. (cbs) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Enroll as Counsel of Record
Tue 10/10 12:28 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Michelle T. Butler by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.(Kingsley, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 09/27 9:54 AM
Summons Issued as to Otto Candies, L.L.C. (tm) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Tue 09/26 10:24 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. (jeg) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 09/25 4:08 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Otto Candies, L.L.C. (Filed on behalf of USA - Filing Fee not required) filed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.Attorney Andrew Burke Kingsley added to party U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission(pty:pla).(Kingsley, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |