Vitamin World, Inc. v. Robinson Pharma, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-11933
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-11933
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kevin J Carey |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-51530 |
Nature of Suit | 71 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - imposition of stay |
Case Filed: | Sep 25, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 27, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Robinson Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vitamin World, Inc.
4320 Veterans Highway
Holbrook, NY 11741 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 02/27 2:39 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice Filed by Robinson Pharma, Inc., Vitamin World, Inc.. (Minuti, Mark) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 02/27 3:06 PM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51530 Closed (LMD) |
||
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 11/06 9:15 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Robinson Pharma, Inc. Mediation due date: 03/6/2018. (Lally, David) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
crditcrd
none
Tue 09/26 9:05 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-51530 KJC) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8595395, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Shorten - Motion
Mon 09/25 8:56 PM
Motion to Shorten Consideration of Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction Filed by Vitamin World, Inc.. (Minuti, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order | ||
4 | 4
misc
Declaration
Mon 09/25 8:52 PM
Declaration of Michael Madden Filed by Vitamin World, Inc.. (Minuti, Mark) |
|
3 | 3
15
pgs
misc
Memorandum of Law
Mon 09/25 8:49 PM
Memorandum of Law in Support of Emergency Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Filed by Vitamin World, Inc.. (Minuti, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Preliminary Injunction - Motion
Mon 09/25 8:46 PM
Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and , Motion for Preliminary Injunction Filed by Vitamin World, Inc.. (Minuti, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order | ||
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Mon 09/25 8:29 PM
Adversary case 17-51530 Complaint for Emergency Injunctive Relief and Specific Performance by Vitamin World, Inc. against Robinson Pharma, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (71 (Injunctive relief - reinstatement of stay)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/26/2017. (Minuti, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |