Gregory Clayborn et al v. County of San Bernardino et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andrew J Guilford |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-01953 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Wrongful Death |
Case Filed: | Sep 25, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 13, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 24, 2018 2:53 AM PDT |
Defendant
Allied Universal
|
|
Defendant
Alliedbarton Security Services, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Alliedbarton Security Services, LP
|
|
Defendant
California Housing Foundation
|
|
Defendant
State Of California
|
|
Defendant
County of San Bernardino
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Defendant
Department of Homeland Security
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Department of Justice
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Inland Counties Regional Center, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Thalasinos
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jacob Thalasinos
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vanessa Nguyen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trung Do
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tamishia Clayborn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Clayborn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory Clayborn
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) - optional html form
Thu 02/15 8:58 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to San Bernardino Superior Court, San Bernardino Justice Center. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to San Bernardino Superior Court, San Bernardino Justice Center. (lwag) |
|
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
order
Dismiss Case
Thu 02/15 8:55 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Granting Federal Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; Remanding Case to State Court14 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court GRANTS the U.S. Department of Homeland Security and the U.S. Department of Justices motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction. (Dkt. No. 14.) The Court DISMISSESPlaintiffs claims against the Department of Homeland Security and the Department of Justice without leave to amend in this Court at this time. The Court REMANDS this case to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Bernardino. The Court declines to rule on the other Defendants' pending motions. (Dkt. Nos. 8,9,12). See document for further information. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (lwag) |
|
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
minutes
Motion Hearing
Fri 02/16 11:43 AM
MINUTES RE: Motion to Dismiss8 , Motion to Strike9 , Motion to Dismiss12 and Motion to Dismiss14 held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Cause is called for hearing and counsel make their appearances. Matter is argued and taken under submission. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (lwag) |
|
29 | 29
misc
Miscellaneous Document
Mon 02/12 9:35 AM
Notice of dismissal of certain claims filed by Plaintiffs Trung Do, Vanessa Nguyen, Jacob Thalasinos, James Thalasinos (Watkins, Ashton) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Declaration (Motion related)
Tue 01/16 10:08 AM
DECLARATION of Philip Haney In Opposition to Defendants NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; and Declarations of Lori Lee Holland and Julia Castillo in Support Thereof 14 filed by Plaintiffs Gregory Clayborn, Kimberly Clayborn, Tamishia Clayborn, Trung Do, Vanessa Nguyen, Jacob Thalasinos, James Thalasinos. (Salazar, Theida) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 12/14 1:27 PM
ORDER TO CONTINUE DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the hearing date on Defendants Motions to Dismiss is continued to February 12, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference is continued to March 12, 2018 at 9:00 a.m.26 (es) |
|
26 | 26
stip
Continue
Thu 12/14 11:52 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Date on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Scheduling Conference from Motions January 22, 2018 & Scheduling Conference January 8, 2018 to Motions to February 12, 2018 & Scheduling Conference to March 12, 2018 filed by Federal Defendants Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice.(Zatz, Julie) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order to Continue Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Scheduling Conference | ||
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines
Tue 12/12 9:50 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order Continuing Hearing on Motions to Dismiss by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: For reasons of calendar management, the Court CONTINUES the hearing on the pending motions to dismiss, currently set for December 18, 2017 to January 22, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. (lwag) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 12/04 5:35 PM
REPLY to Non-Opposition of Plaintiff to Defendant County of San Bernardino's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Damages; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendant County of San Bernardino. (Smith, G) |
|
23 | 23
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 12/04 5:31 PM
REPLY to Non-Opposition of Plaintiff to Defendant County of San Bernardino's Motion to Strike Portions of First Amended Complaint for Damages; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendant County of San Bernardino. (Smith, G) |
|
22 | 22
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 12/04 3:51 PM
REPLY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 12 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Inland Counties Regional Center, Inc.. (Luevanos, Eligio) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Reply
Mon 12/04 1:46 PM
REPLY filed by Defendants Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice to MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion19 (mj) (Zatz, Julie) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Thu 11/30 3:07 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Darin L Wessel counsel for Defendant County of San Bernardino. Darin Lee Wessel is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant County of San Bernardino. (Wessel, Darin) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
10
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Tue 11/28 10:53 AM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition Defendants Department of Homeland Security and Department of Justice's Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Gregory Clayborn, Kimberly Clayborn, Tamishia Clayborn. (Watkins, Ashton) |
|
18 | 18
11
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Tue 11/28 10:51 AM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition Inland Regional Center, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Gregory Clayborn, Kimberly Clayborn, Tamishia Clayborn. (Watkins, Ashton) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Mon 11/27 4:37 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney G Craig Smith counsel for Defendant County of San Bernardino. Adding G. Craig Smith as counsel of record for Defendant, County of San Bernardino for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant County of San Bernardino. (Attorney G Craig Smith added to party County of San Bernardino(pty:dft))(Smith, G) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Fri 11/17 11:55 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Scott W Davenport counsel for Defendant County of San Bernardino. Adding Scott W. Davenport as counsel of record for County of San Bernardino for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant County of San Bernardino. (Attorney Scott W Davenport added to party County of San Bernardino(pty:dft))(Davenport, Scott) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Fri 11/17 10:31 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Eugene P Ramirez counsel for Defendant County of San Bernardino. Adding Eugene P. Ramirez as counsel of record for County of San Bernardino for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant County of San Bernardino. (Attorney Eugene P Ramirez added to party County of San Bernardino(pty:dft))(Ramirez, Eugene) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss Case
Thu 11/16 4:40 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; and Declarations of Lori Lee Holland and Julia Castillo in Support Thereof filed by Federal Defendants Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice. Motion set for hearing on 12/18/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Zatz, Julie) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment 1 - Declaration of Julia Castillo, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment 2 - Declaration of Lori Lee Holland, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 11/15 2:20 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Inland Counties Regional Center, Inc., identifying Inland Counties Regional Center, Inc.. (Luevanos, Eligio) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss Case
Wed 11/15 2:12 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Inland Counties Regional Center, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 12/18/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attorney Eligio Jose Luevanos added to party Inland Counties Regional Center, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Luevanos, Eligio) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B | ||
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Wed 11/01 11:21 AM
ORDER RE EARLY MEETING OF PARTIES AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/8/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (lb) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Wed 11/01 9:00 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case8 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. EDCV17-1953 AG(MRWx) In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Strike
Tue 10/31 5:00 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Portions of First Amended Complaint (Doc. 1-1) Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant County of San Bernardino. Motion set for hearing on 12/18/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Wessel, Darin) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Strike Portions of First Amended Complaint (Doc. 1-1), | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Darin L. Wessel re: Attempts to Meet and Confer pursuant to L.R. 7-3, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 Proof of Service | ||
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss Case
Tue 10/31 4:52 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and First Amended Complaint for Damages filed by Defendant County of San Bernardino. Motion set for hearing on 12/18/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attorney Darin L Wessel added to party County of San Bernardino(pty:dft)) (Wessel, Darin) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Doc. 1-1) or for a More Definite Statement, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Darin L. Wessel re: Attempts to Meet and Confer per L.R. 7-3, | ||
Att: 3 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint or for a More Definite Statement, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibits A to E to Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 6 Proof of Service | ||
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 09/29 3:16 PM
ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, Extending Time to Answer, Plead or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint.6 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the Federal Defendants may have until November 16, 2017 to answer, plead or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint. (es) |
|
6 | 6
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Fri 09/29 2:43 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to November 16, 2017 filed by Federal Defendants Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice.(Zatz, Julie) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
transfer
Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form
Tue 09/26 11:43 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 16-05, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:17-cv-01953 AG (MRWx). (jtil) |
|
4 | 4
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 09/26 11:38 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
transfer
Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73) - optional html form
Tue 09/26 11:27 AM
NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Andrew J. Guilford for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Michael R. Wilner. New Case Number 5:17-cv-01953 AG (MRWx). (jtil) |
|
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice. (Zatz, Julie) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino, case number CIVDS 1612898 No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Defendant Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice. (Attorney Julie Zatz added to party Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Julie Zatz added to party Department of Justice(pty:dft))(Zatz, Julie) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Tue 09/26 11:00 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs in San Bernardino Superior Court on 9/25/2017, and attached to Notice of Removal as Exhibit A. (jtil) |