New York Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Margaret M Cangilos-Ruiz
Case #: 5:09-bk-30057
Case Filed:Jan 14, 2009
Creditor Meeting:Feb 20, 2009
Terminated:Jun 22, 2012
Plan Confirmed:Feb 11, 2010
Discharge Objection Deadline:Dec 09, 2009

Debtor
Northeast Biofuels, LP
376 Owen Road P.O.
Fulton, NY 13069
Represented By
Jeffrey A. Dove
Menter, Rudin & Trivelpiece, P.C.
contact info
James C. Thoman
Menter, Rudin & Trivelpiece, P.C.
contact info
Marc E. Richards
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Scott R. Almas
Lemery Greisler LLC
contact info
Eugene R. Scheiman
Arent Fox LLP
contact info
Mark A. Bloom
Arent Fox LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Creditor Committee
Official Comm. of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Stephen A. Donato
Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC
contact info
Camille Wolnik Hill
Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC
contact info
Sara C. Temes
Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Burns Bros. Contractors, Inc.
507 Plum Street Suite 300
Syracuse, NY 13204
Represented By
Douglas J. Mahr
Douglas J. Mahr, Esq., PLLC
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Tracy Hope Davis
U.S. Trustee Office 10 Broad Street, Room 105
Utica, NY 13501
Represented By
Guy A. VanBaalen
Usdoj/u.S. Trustee Office
contact info
Amy F. Quandt
Office Of The Us Trustee
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee Office 10 Broad Street, Room 105
Utica, NY 13501
Represented By
Erin Champion
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info
Guy A. VanBaalen
Usdoj/u.S. Trustee Office
contact info
Amy F. Quandt
Office Of The Us Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 6:07 PM EDT
Friday, June 22, 2012
792 792 Order Approving (I) Report of Substantial Consummation, (II) Release of Settlement Escrow, (III) Disposition of Records, (IV) Indemnification of Distribution Agent, and (V) Entry of Final Decree Closing Case. (Glasheen, Dorothy)
Related: [-]
Disposition of Adversary 5:11-ap-50012 . (Glasheen, Dorothy)
Related: [-]
Adversary Case 5:11-ap-50012 Closed. (Glasheen, Dorothy)
Related: [-]
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Glasheen, Dorothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 21, 2012
790 790 Affidavit of Service Filed by NEB GP, Inc., NEB Holdings, LP, Northeast Biofuels, LP Related [+]. (Dove, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 788 ,787 ,789
789 789 Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period May 2012 Filed by NEB GP, Inc.. (Dove, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
788 788 Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period May 2012 Filed by NEB Holdings, LP. (Dove, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
787 787 Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period May 2012 Filed by Northeast Biofuels, LP. (Dove, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Hearing Held Related [+]. Granted. Order due by 7/23/2012. (Behm, Carolyn)
Related: [-] ,784