Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Cathy Bissoon
Case #: 2:17-cv-01249
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2017
Terminated:Mar 16, 2018
Last checked: Sunday Mar 25, 2018 4:14 AM EDT
Defendant
DANIEL BOSNIC
Represented By
Christina L. Lane
Maiello Brungo & Maiello
contact info
Michael L. Brungo
Maiello, Brungo & Maiello, P.C.
contact info
Roger W. Foley, Jr.
Maiello, Brungo & Maiello, LLP
contact info
Defendant
JEREMY BRAIN
Represented By
Christina L. Lane
Maiello Brungo & Maiello
contact info
Michael L. Brungo
Maiello, Brungo & Maiello, P.C.
contact info
Roger W. Foley, Jr.
Maiello, Brungo & Maiello, LLP
contact info
Defendant
DONALD GMITTER
Represented By
Christina L. Lane
Maiello Brungo & Maiello
contact info
Michael L. Brungo
Maiello, Brungo & Maiello, P.C.
contact info
Roger W. Foley, Jr.
Maiello, Brungo & Maiello, LLP
contact info
Defendant
ROBERT MANGES
Represented By
Christina L. Lane
Maiello Brungo & Maiello
contact info
Michael L. Brungo
Maiello, Brungo & Maiello, P.C.
contact info
Roger W. Foley, Jr.
Maiello, Brungo & Maiello, LLP
contact info
Defendant
DEBORAH RITTENHOUSE
Represented By
Christina L. Lane
Maiello Brungo & Maiello
contact info
Michael L. Brungo
Maiello, Brungo & Maiello, P.C.
contact info
Roger W. Foley, Jr.
Maiello, Brungo & Maiello, LLP
contact info
Defendant
HEATHER SEFCHEK
Represented By
Christina L. Lane
Maiello Brungo & Maiello
contact info
Michael L. Brungo
Maiello, Brungo & Maiello, P.C.
contact info
Roger W. Foley, Jr.
Maiello, Brungo & Maiello, LLP
contact info
Defendant
UNIONTOWN AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By
Christina L. Lane
Maiello Brungo & Maiello
contact info
Michael L. Brungo
Maiello, Brungo & Maiello, P.C.
contact info
Roger W. Foley, Jr.
Maiello, Brungo & Maiello, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
RACHAEL L. FRITTS
Represented By
Massimo A. Terzigni
Law Offices Of Joel Sansone
contact info
Joel S. Sansone
Law Offices Of Joel Sansone
contact info
Elizabeth Tuttle
Law Offices Of Joel Sansone
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Mediator
PATRICIA L. DODGE
Terminated: 03/16/2018
Represented By
Patricia L. Dodge
Meyer, Unkovic & Scott LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, March 16, 2018
26 26 order Order Statistical Case Closing Fri 03/16 11:09 AM
ORDER FOR STATISTICAL CLOSING. The court has been advised that the above captioned action has been settled and that the only matters remaining are the execution of the settlement document and the compliance of the terms set out in the settlement agreement, see25 . It appears that there is no further action required by the Court at this time. It is, accordingly, hereby ORDERED that the Clerk mark the above captioned case closed; that nothing contained in this Order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this action, and that should further proceedings therein become necessary or desirable, either party may initiate the same in the identical manner as if this order had not been entered. FURTHER, the Court expressly retains jurisdiction in this matter to consider any issue arising during the period when settlement is being finalized, including, but not limited to, enforcing settlement. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 3/16/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jhi)
Related: [-]
25 25 adr Report of Mediation Fri 03/16 9:48 AM
REPORT of Mediation: Case has been resolved. PATRICIA L. DODGE terminated. Attorney Patricia L. Dodge terminated. The parties are reminded of their obligation to complete the ADR questionnaire and submit within 5 days of the conclusion of the ADR process. The questionnaire can be accessed at www.pawd.uscourts.gov. Click on the ADR icon. Mediation session was held on 3/15/2018. (Dodge, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 08, 2018
24 24 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Thu 03/08 5:31 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part23 Joint Motion for Protective Order. See contents of this filing. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 3/8/18. (rdl)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Protective Order Thu 03/08 9:50 AM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by DANIEL BOSNIC, JEREMY BRAIN, DONALD GMITTER, ROBERT MANGES, DEBORAH RITTENHOUSE, HEATHER SEFCHEK, UNIONTOWN AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Lane, Christina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Acknowledgement,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 24, 2018
22 22 order Order Referring Case to Mediation Wed 01/24 2:47 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Patricia L. Dodge, Esq. is appointed as mediator. Party PATRICIA L. DODGE added. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 1/24/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rdl)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Case Management Order Wed 01/24 11:37 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. See contents of this filing for detailed instructions and deadlines. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 1/24/18. (rdl)
Related: [-]
20 20 minutes Case Management Conference Wed 01/24 11:00 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Bissoon: Case Management Conference held on 1/24/2018. (Court Reporter: None) Order to follow. (jhi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2018
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/23 4:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Massimo A. Terzigni on behalf of RACHAEL L. FRITTS. (Terzigni, Massimo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2018
18 18 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Wed 01/17 3:27 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lane, Christina)
Related: [-]
17 17 adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Wed 01/17 3:26 PM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by DANIEL BOSNIC, JEREMY BRAIN, DONALD GMITTER, ROBERT MANGES, DEBORAH RITTENHOUSE, HEATHER SEFCHEK, UNIONTOWN AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Lane, Christina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2018
16 16 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 01/04 6:25 AM
ORDER, Case Management Conference set for 1/23/18 is now RESCHEDULED TO 1/24/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge Cathy Bissoon. All other conditions/deadlines in order dated 12/12/1714 remain in effect. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 1/4/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jhi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2017
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/12 9:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Tuttle on behalf of RACHAEL L. FRITTS. (Tuttle, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
14 14 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 12/12 8:02 AM
ORDER, setting Case Management Conference before Judge Cathy Bissoon, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 12/12/17. (jhi)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2017
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/11 7:01 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by DANIEL BOSNIC, JEREMY BRAIN, DONALD GMITTER, ROBERT MANGES, DEBORAH RITTENHOUSE, HEATHER SEFCHEK, UNIONTOWN AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Lane, Christina)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2017
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/13 1:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Brungo on behalf of DANIEL BOSNIC, JEREMY BRAIN, DONALD GMITTER, ROBERT MANGES, DEBORAH RITTENHOUSE, HEATHER SEFCHEK, UNIONTOWN AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Brungo, Michael)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/13 1:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christina L. Lane on behalf of DANIEL BOSNIC, JEREMY BRAIN, DONALD GMITTER, ROBERT MANGES, DEBORAH RITTENHOUSE, HEATHER SEFCHEK, UNIONTOWN AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Lane, Christina)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/13 1:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Roger W. Foley, Jr on behalf of DANIEL BOSNIC, JEREMY BRAIN, DONALD GMITTER, ROBERT MANGES, DEBORAH RITTENHOUSE, HEATHER SEFCHEK, UNIONTOWN AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Foley, Roger)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2017
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 11/02 10:52 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RACHAEL L. FRITTS. JEREMY BRAIN waiver sent on 10/11/2017, answer due 12/11/2017. (Sansone, Joel)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 11/02 10:51 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RACHAEL L. FRITTS. HEATHER SEFCHEK waiver sent on 10/11/2017, answer due 12/11/2017. (Sansone, Joel)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 11/02 10:50 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RACHAEL L. FRITTS. DANIEL BOSNIC waiver sent on 10/11/2017, answer due 12/11/2017. (Sansone, Joel)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 11/02 10:49 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RACHAEL L. FRITTS. DEBORAH RITTENHOUSE waiver sent on 10/11/2017, answer due 12/11/2017. (Sansone, Joel)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 11/02 10:48 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RACHAEL L. FRITTS. ROBERT MANGES waiver sent on 10/11/2017, answer due 12/11/2017. (Sansone, Joel)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 11/02 10:47 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RACHAEL L. FRITTS. DONALD GMITTER waiver sent on 10/11/2017, answer due 12/11/2017. (Sansone, Joel)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 11/02 10:46 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RACHAEL L. FRITTS. UNIONTOWN AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT waiver sent on 10/11/2017, answer due 12/11/2017. (Sansone, Joel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2017
2 2 2 pgs order Order Wed 09/27 11:39 AM
ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) motions to dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 9/27/17. (rdl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Wed 09/27 10:53 AM
COMPLAINT against DANIEL BOSNIC, JEREMY BRAIN, DONALD GMITTER, ROBERT MANGES, DEBORAH RITTENHOUSE, HEATHER SEFCHEK, UNIONTOWN AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4475502), filed by RACHAEL L. FRITTS. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsp)
Related: [-]