California Northern District Court
Judge:Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Referred: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Case #: 4:14-cv-00226
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2014
Terminated:Mar 02, 2018
Last checked: Thursday Jan 22, 2015 7:15 AM PST
Defendant
Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.
Represented By
Patrick Edward Gibbs
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Ming M Zhu
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Rory P. Read
Represented By
Patrick Edward Gibbs
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Ming M Zhu
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Thomas J. Seifert
Represented By
Patrick Edward Gibbs
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Ming M Zhu
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Lisa T. Su
Represented By
Patrick Edward Gibbs
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Ming M Zhu
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Richard A. Bergman
Represented By
Patrick Edward Gibbs
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Ming M Zhu
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Movant
Arkansas Teacher Retirement System
Represented By
Sharon Maine Lee
Lieff Cabraser Heimann Bernstein
contact info
Carol C. Villegas
Labaton Sucharow LLP
contact info
Jonathan Gardner
Labaton Sucharow LLP
contact info
Nicole Catherine Lavallee
Berman Devalerio
contact info
Paul J Scarlato
Labaton Sucharow LLP
contact info
Movant
KBC Asset Management NV
Represented By
Sharon Maine Lee
Lieff Cabraser Heimann Bernstein
contact info
James Michael Hughes
Motley Rice LLC
contact info
Jonathan Gardner
Labaton Sucharow LLP
contact info
William S. Norton
Motley Rice LLC
contact info
Joy Ann Kruse
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Movant
Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System
Represented By
Michael M. Goldberg
Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Babak Hatamian
Represented By
Shawn A. Williams
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
Joy Ann Kruse
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Lussu Dennj Salvatore
Represented By
Shawn A. Williams
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
Joy Ann Kruse
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info

GPO Sep 08 2014
ORDER REQUIRING PREPARATION OF SUPPLEMENTAL CHART. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/5/14. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
GPO Sep 16 2014
ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Hon. James Donato no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/16/14. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
GPO Feb 06 2015
ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 70 Motion to Strike (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2015)
GPO Mar 31 2015
ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 66 Motion to Dismiss (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
GPO Jun 23 2015
ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying without prejudice 125 Stipulation (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2015)
GPO Jun 29 2015
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 127 Proposed Order filed by Richard A. Bergman, Thomas J. Seifert, Rory P. Read, Lisa T. Su, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 127 Proposed Order. Amended Pleadings due by 2/19/2016. Non-Expert Discovery due by 6/15/2016. Joinder of Parties due by 2/19/2016. Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions due by 11/17/2016. Replies due by 2/16/2017. Responses due by 1/16/2017. Compliance Hearing re name of private mediator Conference set for 7/10/2015 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/29/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2015)
GPO Jul 08 2015
ORDER VACATING COMPLIANCE HEARING SET FOR 7/10/15 AT 9:01AM. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/8/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2015)
GPO Sep 24 2015
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL re 149 Letter from Defendants requesting discovery relief filed by Richard A. Bergman, Thomas J. Seifert, Rory P. Read, Lisa T. Su, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/24/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
GPO Oct 08 2015
STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING ATTORNEYS' EYES ONLY MATERIALS [MODIFED BY THE COURT AT 6.3]. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/8/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2015)
GPO Nov 16 2015
ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/16/2015 (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
GPO Dec 08 2015
ORDER STRIKING PLAINTIFFS' REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF CLASS CERTIFICATION re 164 Reply to Opposition/Response filed by KBC Asset Management NV, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/8/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
GPO Dec 17 2015
ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 170 Stipulation to Stay Without Prejudice (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
GPO Mar 16 2016
ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 143 Motion to Certify Class.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
GPO Apr 13 2016
ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE ( 185 Letter filed by KBC Asset Management NV ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/13/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
GPO May 06 2016
ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE Re: Dkt. Nos. 182, 190. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/6/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
GPO May 16 2016
ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE PERTAINING TO NUMBER OF DEPOSITIONS. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/16/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
GPO Aug 19 2016
ORDER EXTENDING LOCAL RULE 37-3 DEADLINE AS TO CERTAIN DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/19/2016.(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
GPO Oct 27 2016
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part 207 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2016)
GPO Mar 22 2017
ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 232 Motion to Intervene. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
GPO Oct 25 2017
ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 332 Motion Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; Approving Form and Manner of Notice and Setting Date for Hearing on Final Approval of Settlement. Final Approval Hearing set 2/27/2018 at 2:00PM. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
GPO Mar 02 2018
ORDER APPROVING PLAN OF ALLOCATION. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/2/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
GPO Mar 02 2018
ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES, PAYMENT OF EXPENSES, AND PAYMENT OF CLASS REPRESENTATIVES' EXPENSES. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/2/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
GPO Mar 06 2018
FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT [*AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT*]. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/6/2018. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, January 03, 2019
375 375 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds Thu 01/03 2:31 PM
ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 372 Motion for Settlement Distribution to Authorized Claimants and Granting Related Relief. (fs, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]