Kevin Culp, et al v. Kwame Raoul, et al
Original Case: 3:14-cv-03320
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02998 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 27, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 12, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2019 3:28 AM CDT |
Amicus Curiae
EVERYTOWN FOR GUN SAFETY
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
LISA MADIGAN, in her Official capacity as Attorney General of the State of Illinois
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JESSICA TRAME, as Bureau Chief of the Illinois State Police Firearms Services Bureau
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
LEO P. SCHMITZ, in his official capacity as Director of the Illinois State Police
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
KWAME RAOUL, in his Official capacity as Attorney General of the State of Illinois
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
KEVIN W. CULP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARLOW DAVIS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
FREDDIE REED-DAVIS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
DOUGLAS W. ZYLSTRA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOHN S. KOLLER
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/15/2019 3:26 AM CDT |
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Transcript information sheet due by 10/11/2017. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Kevin W. Culp, Marlow Davis, John S. Koller, Freddie Reed-Davis and Douglas W. Zylstra by 10/04/2017. Appellant's brief due on or before 11/06/2017 for Kevin W. Culp, Marlow Davis, John S. Koller, Freddie Reed-Davis and Douglas W. Zylstra. [1] [6872099] 17-2998 (AD) [Entered: 09/27/2017 02:27 PM] | |
Att: 1 76 pgs Civil Case | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court | ||
2 | 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLANTS: Steve Stevenson, Paul Heslin, Marlin Mangels, Jeanelle Westrom, second amendment Foundation, Inc., Illinois Carry and Illinois State Rifle Association. [2] [6872106] 17-2998 (AD) [Entered: 09/27/2017 02:34 PM] |