Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-12863

Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Arthur I Harris
Case #: 1:17-ap-01126
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2017
Terminated:Dec 06, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
DBS Financial
2823 Gilchrist Road
Akron, OH 44305
Represented By
DBS Financial
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer J. Cavor
4361 Clarkwood Ln.
Warrensville Heights, OH 44128
Represented By
Antoinette E. Freeburg
Freeburg Law Firm, Lpa
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, December 06, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Wed 12/06 8:59 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-1126 Closed (athre)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2017
court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched No Notice Tue 11/28 2:57 PM
PRETRIAL Hearing Rescheduled - ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED Related [+]. PRETRIAL Hearing scheduled for 12/19/2017 at 01:30 PM at H.M. Metzenbaum - #1A Judge Harris Courtroom. (athre)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, November 27, 2017
4 4 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Mon 11/27 2:26 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Jennifer J. Cavor. (Freeburg, Antoinette aty)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2017
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Mon 10/30 12:14 PM
Alias Summons issued on Plaintiff for service on Defendant(s) DBS Financial Answer due 11/29/2017. This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the summons in an adversary proceeding. The attached summons has been sealed, processed, and docketed by the Clerk. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of the summons will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a) and F.R.C.P. 4, it is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to promptly serve the summons, a copy of the complaint, and, if applicable, a copy of any pre-trial or adversary case management order on defendant(s). To be timely, the summons and a copy of the complaint must be served within seven (7) days of issuance per Bankruptcy Rule 7004(e). Service of the summons is prescribed by Bankruptcy Rule 7004 and F.R.C.P. 4. If a summons is not timely served, an ''alias'' summons must be requested from the Clerk. Certification or proof of service by plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is made by completing the Certificate of Service portion of the original summons. Attorneys should docket the summons, once served, using the Summons Service Executed event within CM/ECF. Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/19/2017 at 01:30 PM at H.M. Metzenbaum - #1A Judge Harris Courtroom. (pzeho)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Jennifer J. Cavor
Friday, October 27, 2017
misc Request for Issuance of Alias Summons Fri 10/27 3:07 PM
Request for Issuance of Alias Summons (Freeburg, Antoinette aty)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2017
2 2 cmp Summons Issued Thu 09/28 8:59 AM
Summons issued on Plaintiff for service on Defendant(s) DBS Financial Answer due 10/30/2017. This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the summons in an adversary proceeding. The attached summons has been sealed, processed, and docketed by the Clerk. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of the summons will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a) and F.R.C.P. 4, it is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to promptly serve the summons, a copy of the complaint, and, if applicable, a copy of any pre-trial or adversary case management order on defendant(s). To be timely, the summons and a copy of the complaint must be served within seven (7) days of issuance per Bankruptcy Rule 7004(e). Service of the summons is prescribed by Bankruptcy Rule 7004 and F.R.C.P. 4. If a summons is not timely served, an ''alias'' summons must be requested from the Clerk. Certification or proof of service by plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is made by completing the Certificate of Service portion of the original summons. Attorneys should docket the summons, once served, using the Summons Service Executed event within CM/ECF. Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/28/2017 at 01:30 PM at H.M. Metzenbaum - #1A Judge Harris Courtroom. (ejone)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Jennifer J. Cavor
Wednesday, September 27, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/27 7:04 PM
Adversary case 17-01126 Complaint by Jennifer J. Cavor against DBS Financial. Fee Amount $0 Nature of Suit:12 Related [+] (Freeburg, Antoinette aty)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference