Cobalt Coal Ltd. v. G.E.M. Holdings U.S. Corporation
Virginia Western District Court | |
Judge: | James P Jones |
Referred: | Pamela Meade Sargent |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00039 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Sep 27, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 21, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 12/19/2023 11:59 PM EST |
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 06/21 3:11 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 6/21/18. (ejs) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 06/21 11:18 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cobalt Coal Ltd. (Bieger, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, June 05, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 06/05 3:06 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting5 Motion extension of time until 6/30/18 to serve defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 6/5/18. (PMS) |
|
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 06/04 11:44 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Complaint by Cobalt Coal Ltd..Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Bieger, Daniel) |
|
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order to Respond
Mon 05/21 2:57 PM
ORDER that service must be effected within 14 days of this order, or good cause shown within such time to further extend the period within which service may be made; otherwise, this action will be dismissed as to said defendant without prejudice. (Plt's Responses due by 6/4/2018). Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 5/21/18. (flc) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Thu 09/28 10:01 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to G.E.M. Holdings U.S. Corporation NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (ab) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 09/28 9:41 AM
Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cobalt Coal Ltd. (ab) |
|
1 | 1
18
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 09/28 9:37 AM
COMPLAINT against G.E.M. Holdings U.S. Corporation (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt number 0423-2757237.), filed by Cobalt Coal Ltd..(ab) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit M |