Sadowski v. Beasley Media Group, Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Valerie E Caproni |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-07488 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Sep 30, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 11, 2017 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 29, 2018 5:32 AM EDT |
Defendant
Beasley Media Group, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Sadowski
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Terminated - Submitted
Thu 10/12 10:22 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 10/11/2017 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (km) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 10/11 1:24 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Beasley Media Group, Inc.. Document filed by Christopher Sadowski. (Liebowitz, Richard) |
|
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Mediation Referral Order
Thu 10/05 9:13 AM
MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: This case, involving claims under the Copyright Act, 17 U.S.C. § 101 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Court's experience, cases involving copyright claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference, the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. The parties are hereby notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation, and the parties are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. No later than one week after the conclusion of all mediation in this case, the parties are directed to notify the Court whether they successfully resolved the case in mediation. The Court specifically requests a mediator with expertise in copyright matters be assigned....the above-entitled action is eligible for mediation, pursuant to the Civil Justice Expense and Delay Reduction Plan. This action is eligible for mediation subject to the limitations and restrictions as noted: ALL ISSUES ARE ELIGIBLE. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 10/16/2017. Mediator Expertise Request due by 10/10/2017. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/4/2017) (rj) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 10/03 12:16 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 10/02 9:29 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Beasley Media Group, Inc. (vf) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 10/02 9:19 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 10/02 9:23 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 10/02 9:23 AM
Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 10/02 9:24 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney to Submit AO 120 Form/AO 121 Form
Mon 10/02 9:30 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (vf) |
||
Saturday, September 30, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Sat 09/30 1:17 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Beasley Media Group, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Christopher Sadowski. (Liebowitz, Richard) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sat 09/30 1:15 AM
COMPLAINT against Beasley Media Group, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14190201)Document filed by Christopher Sadowski.(Liebowitz, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C |