Original Case: 4:16-cv-00052

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:17-cv-03019
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2017
Terminated:Apr 30, 2020
Last checked: Saturday May 02, 2020 3:38 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
J.P. MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By
Jordan S. Huttenlocker
DYKEMA GOSSETT PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
ANTHONY G. TAYLOR
Represented By
Brian Wolfman
GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY LAW CENTER
contact info
Bradley Girard
GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY LAW CENTER
contact info
Anthony G. Taylor
contact info

GPO Apr 30 2020
Filed opinion of the court by Judge Scudder. AFFIRMED. Diane S. Sykes, Circuit Judge; David F. Hamilton, Circuit Judge, dissenting, and Michael Y. Scudder, Circuit Judge. [7078057-1] [7078057] [17-3019]

Docket last updated: 05/02/2020 3:33 AM CDT
Friday, September 29, 2017
1 1 Private civil case docketed. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 10/13/2017. [1] [6872839] 17-3019 (CG) [Entered: 09/29/2017 03:25 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 29 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court