Pete Enterprises, Inc.
Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Arthur I Harris |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-15807 |
Case Filed: | Oct 02, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Nov 29, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 13, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Pete Enterprises, Inc.
2445 Saint Clair Ave NE
Cleveland, OH 44114-4010 |
Represented By
|
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 13, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Wed 02/13 3:54 PM
Case Closed. (nbrow) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
BNC
Notice of Dismissal
Sat 12/02 12:22 AM
Notice of Dismissal w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 12/01/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Dismissing Case
Wed 11/29 2:30 PM
Order Dismissing Case with Prejudice. Signed on 11/29/2017 . (nbrow crt) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
court
Hearing Held
Wed 11/29 8:40 AM
Hearing Held |
||
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Response
Tue 11/07 10:49 AM
Response to Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Pete Enterprises, Inc. (Forbes, Glenn aty) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
court
Meeting of Creditors Held
Fri 11/03 8:48 AM
Meeting of Creditors Held Filed by United States Trustee.(ust07, Sharon Nollsch tr) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Motion
Thu 11/02 3:30 PM
Notice of Motion of United States Trustee for Entry of an Order Dismissing with Prejudice Debtor's Chapter 11 Case Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 1112(b) Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee . Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 11:00 AM at H.M. Metzenbaum - #1A Judge Harris Courtroom. (ust401, Tiiara N. A. Patton tr) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss Case
Thu 11/02 3:29 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case - Motion of United States Trustee for Entry of an Order Dismissing with Prejudice Debtor's Chapter 11 Case Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 1112(b) Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (ust401, Tiiara N. A. Patton tr) |
|
7 | 7
trustee
Notice of Inability to Appoint Creditors' Committee
Thu 11/02 2:00 PM
Notice of Inability to Appoint Creditors' Committee Filed by United States Trustee.(ust07, Sharon Nollsch tr) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
BNC
Notice of 341 Meeting of Creditors
Fri 10/13 12:23 AM
Notice of 341 Meeting of Creditors w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 10/12/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Corp
Tue 10/10 7:20 AM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/2/2017 at 10:30 AM at Office of US Trustee, 341 meeting, 6th Floor, H.M.M.. Filed by United States Trustee.(ust19, PS tr) |
||
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 10/03 1:09 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Tiiara N. A. Patton ust401 Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee. (ust401, Tiiara N. A. Patton tr) |
|
court
ADI List of Creditors Uploaded
Tue 10/03 8:30 AM
List of Creditors File Uploaded (ADILstUpd) |
||
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Employ
Mon 10/02 9:24 AM
Application to Employ Glenn E Forbes as Debtors Attorney Filed by Debtor Pete Enterprises, Inc. (Forbes, Glenn aty) |
|
Att: 1 Agreement Employing Attorney | ||
Att: 2 Verified Statement | ||
2 | 2
court
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing
Mon 10/02 9:04 AM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Filed by Debtor Pete Enterprises, Inc.. (Forbes, Glenn aty) |
|
1 | 1
34
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 10/02 8:24 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Pete Enterprises, Inc. Chapter 11 Small Business Plan due by 04/2/2018. Disclosure Statement due by 04/2/2018. (Forbes, Glenn aty) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Mon 10/02 8:27 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-15807 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 36732433. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |