Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-21958

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Christine M Gravelle
Case #: 3:17-ap-01639
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2017
Terminated:Dec 21, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Anthony Trocchio
17 Eisele Avenue
Ocean, NJ 07712
Represented By
Anthony Trocchio
contact info
Plaintiff
Social Security Administration
Office of General Counsel, Region II 26 Federal Plaza, Room 3904
New York, NY 10278
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Rothstein
U.S. Attorney'S Office, District Of Nj
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, December 21, 2017
utility Close Adversary Case Thu 12/21 3:50 PM
Adversary Case (3:17-ap-1639) Closed. (dmi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2017
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Thu 12/14 12:40 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/13/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2017
6 6 8 pgs order Money Judgment Mon 12/11 8:35 AM
CONSENT ORDER DETERMINING G THE EXTENT OF DISCHARGEABILITY OF SOCIAL SECURITY OVER PAYMENT DEBT Related [+] . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/8/2017. (bwj)
Related: [-] 5 Certificate of Consent (Adversary) filed by Plaintiff Social Security Administration
Thursday, December 07, 2017
5 5 misc Certificate of Consent Thu 12/07 6:06 PM
Certificate of Consent Related [+]. Filed by Elizabeth D. Rothstein on behalf of Social Security Administration. (Rothstein, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01639 Complaint by Social Security Administration against Anthony Trocchio. Fee Amount EXEMPT $ 350.. (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E # 6 Exhibit F # 7 Exhibit G # 8 Exhibit H # 9 Exhibit I # 10 Exhibit J # 11 Exhibit K) (Rothstein, Elizabeth) RECEIPT Modified on 10/2/2017 (slf). filed by Plaintiff Social Security Administration
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, December 06, 2017
court Hearing Held Wed 12/06 4:38 PM
Minute of 12/6/17, OUTCOME: SETTLED Related [+] (bwj)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, November 02, 2017
4 4 2 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Thu 11/02 1:00 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by James J. Cerbone on behalf of Anthony Trocchio. (Cerbone, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2017
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 10/04 11:52 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Elizabeth D. Rothstein on behalf of Social Security Administration. (Rothstein, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01639 Complaint by Social Security Administration against Anthony Trocchio. Fee Amount EXEMPT $ 350.. (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E # 6 Exhibit F # 7 Exhibit G # 8 Exhibit H # 9 Exhibit I # 10 Exhibit J # 11 Exhibit K) (Rothstein, Elizabeth) RECEIPT Modified on 10/2/2017 (slf). filed by Plaintiff Social Security Administration
Monday, October 02, 2017
2 2 1 pgs court Summons Issued Mon 10/02 9:06 AM
Summons Issued to Social Security Administration for Service on Anthony Trocchio Answer due on 11/1/2017 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 12/6/2017 at 03:00 PM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (gan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pre Trial Instructions Joint Scheduling Order, Mediation Order
Friday, September 29, 2017
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/29 4:42 PM
Adversary case 17-01639 Complaint by Social Security Administration against Anthony Trocchio. Fee Amount EXEMPT $ 350.. (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (Rothstein, Elizabeth) RECEIPT Modified on 10/2/2017 (slf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Att: 6 Exhibit F
Att: 7 Exhibit G
Att: 8 Exhibit H
Att: 9 Exhibit I
Att: 10 Exhibit J
Att: 11 Exhibit K