United Parcel Service, Inc. v. John Does 1-5
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark H Cohen |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03843 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets |
Case Filed: | Oct 02, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 06, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 31, 2018 5:02 AM EDT |
Defendant
John Does 1-5
|
|
Plaintiff
United Parcel Service, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
misc
Clerks Entry of Dismissal
Tue 02/06 9:06 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(i) (bnw) |
||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 02/06 9:07 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (bnw) |
||
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 02/05 10:26 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by United Parcel Service, Inc. (Kingsley, Meredith) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Discovery
Fri 10/20 10:10 AM
ORDER GRANTING7 Motion for Discovery. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall be permitted to take discovery immediately by serving the subpoenas attached to Plaintiffs Motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may require full and complete responses to the subpoenas within (5) calendar days of service. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 10/20/17. (bnw) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Discovery
Thu 10/19 6:03 PM
Emergency MOTION for Discovery with Brief In Support by United Parcel Service, Inc..(Riley, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Discovery
Thu 10/05 11:54 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall be permitted to take discovery immediately by serving the three proposed subpoenas on Yahoo Holdings, Inc., the Independent Pilots Association, and Internet Brands, Inc. attached as Exhibits A, B, and C to Plaintiff's Supplemental Motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may require full and complete responses to these three subpoenas within (5) calendar days of service. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 10/5/17. (bnw) |
|
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Discovery
Wed 10/04 4:51 PM
Supplemental MOTION for Discovery by United Parcel Service, Inc..(Riley, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
28
pgs
order
Order
Tue 10/03 12:31 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 10/3/17. (bnw) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Tue 10/03 11:25 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Mark H. Cohen for all further proceedings. Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:17-cv-03843-MHC. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 10/3/2017. (tcc) |
|
utility
Submission to District Judge
Tue 10/03 1:52 PM
Submission of2 Emergency MOTION for Discovery to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (bnw) |
||
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Discovery
Mon 10/02 5:02 PM
Emergency MOTION for Discovery with Brief In Support by United Parcel Service, Inc..(Riley, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 10/02 4:50 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-7418321.)(eop) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit -A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |