Constantine D Christodoulou
Tennessee Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Case #: | 3:17-bk-33028 |
Case Filed: | Oct 04, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 10/19/2017 7:49 PM EDT |
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
45
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Wed 10/04 9:27 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Thomas Lynn Tarpy on behalf of Constantine D Christodoulou. (Tarpy, Thomas) |
|
2 | 2
misc
SSN Certification
Wed 10/04 9:28 AM
Social Security Number Certification Filed by Thomas Lynn Tarpy on behalf of Debtor Constantine D Christodoulou. (Tarpy, Thomas) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
Wed 10/04 9:28 AM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Thomas Lynn Tarpy on behalf of Debtor Constantine D Christodoulou. (Tarpy, Thomas) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Statement of Intent
Wed 10/04 9:28 AM
Statement of Intent. Filed by Thomas Lynn Tarpy on behalf of Debtor Constantine D Christodoulou. (Tarpy, Thomas) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)
Wed 10/04 9:28 AM
Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income Form 122A-1 Filed by Thomas Lynn Tarpy on behalf of Debtor Constantine D Christodoulou. (Tarpy, Thomas) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Debtor Electronic Noticing Election (DeBN)
Wed 10/04 9:28 AM
Debtor Requests to Begin Electronic Noticing Filed by Thomas Lynn Tarpy on behalf of Debtor Constantine D Christodoulou. (Tarpy, Thomas) |
|
7 | 7
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Wed 10/04 9:30 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(3:17-bk-33028) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 17162486. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
8 | 8
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)
Wed 10/04 9:32 AM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/31/2017 at 02:30 PM at BK Meeting Room, First Floor Knoxville, TN. Objections for Discharge due by 01/02/2018. Objections for Dischargeability due by 01/02/2018. (Tarpy, Thomas) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of Credit Counseling For Debtor(s)
Wed 10/04 9:33 AM
Certificate of Credit Counseling For Debtor(s) Filed by Thomas Lynn Tarpy on behalf of Debtor Constantine D Christodoulou. (Tarpy, Thomas) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Statement Regarding Payment Advices
Wed 10/04 9:34 AM
Statement Regarding Payment Advices or Other Evidence of Payment. Filed by Thomas Lynn Tarpy on behalf of Debtor Constantine D Christodoulou. (Tarpy, Thomas) |