Arizona District Court
Judge:Steven P Logan
Case #: 2:17-cv-03586
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Oct 06, 2017
Terminated:Apr 03, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 04, 2018 1:58 AM MST
Defendant
Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By
Meghan Travers Meade
K & L Gates Llp - Newark, Nj
contact info
Michael S Rubin
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info
Rosemary Alito
K & L Gates Llp - Newark, Nj
contact info
Defendant
Heather Wilson
Represented By
Kristina Louise Morrison
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Plaintiff
David Sellers
Represented By
Andrew S Friedman
Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Andrew M Witko
Employment Law Group PC
contact info
William Fleming King
Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Francis Joseph Balint, Jr.
Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info
R Scott Oswald
Employment Law Group PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, April 03, 2018
35 35 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 04/03 8:38 AM
ORDER granting34 Stipulation of Dismissal. This action is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. The Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 4/2/18. (EJA)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 02, 2018
34 34 2 pgs notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Entire Case/Action Mon 04/02 8:40 AM
*STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by David Sellers. (Witko, Andrew) *Modified to correct event type on 4/2/2018 (EJA)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2018
33 33 4 pgs misc Response Mon 02/26 3:43 PM
*RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re:30 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Heather Wilson. (Morrison, Kristina) *Modified to correct document link on 2/27/2018 (REK).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2018
32 32 4 pgs respoth Lodged Proposed Document Tue 02/13 10:18 PM
LODGED Proposed Sur-Reply re:30 MOTION. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by David Sellers.(Witko, Andrew) *Modified to add linkage on 2/14/2018 (EJA).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Supplement,
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 3 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
Monday, February 12, 2018
31 31 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 02/12 3:17 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice30 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 2/12/18. (CLB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2018
30 30 motion Leave to File Document Thu 02/08 1:17 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by David Sellers.(Witko, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 06, 2018
29 29 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 02/06 11:30 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Heather Wilson.(Morrison, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 12 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 268 pgs Exhibit 2
Monday, February 05, 2018
28 28 motion Protective Order Mon 02/05 3:17 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Lockheed Martin Corporation.(Rubin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 9 pgs Text of Proposed Order
Monday, January 22, 2018
27 27 respm Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 01/22 5:33 PM
*RESPONSE to Motion re:21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by David Sellers.(Witko, Andrew) *Modified on 1/30/2018 to Seal Attachment 5 Pending the Filing of a Motion to Seal (MAP)*.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit Sellers Affidavit,
Att: 2 5 pgs Exhibit Ramos Declaration,
Att: 3 1 pgs Exhibit Memorandum re USAF Disposition,
Att: 4 2 pgs Exhibit LM Position Statement,
Att: 5 4 pgs Exhibit Witness Statement,
Att: 6 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Friday, January 19, 2018
26 26 notice Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery Fri 01/19 2:34 PM
NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Rubin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2018
25 25 notice Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery Thu 01/18 1:06 PM
NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff David Sellers. (Witko, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2018
24 24 1 pgs order MIDP - Order of Extension of Time re Rule 12 ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 01/12 10:01 AM
ORDER: The Motion for Relief23 is granted. The deadline for Defendant United States to file an Answer and Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses shall be deferred pending resolution of the Motion to Dismiss. Following the resolution of the Motion to Dismiss, if necessary, the Court will set and advise the parties regarding the outstanding deadlines. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 1/12/2018. (REK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2018
23 23 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 01/11 2:12 PM
MOTION Relief From Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project re:21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Heather Wilson.(Morrison, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 10, 2018
22 22 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 01/10 11:18 AM
ORDER that Defendant Heather Wilson must file an answer no later than January 17, 2018 or file a motion for appropriate relief that clearly sets forth the MIDP exception which permits deferral of the deadline for filing a responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 1/10/18. (CLB)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2018
21 21 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 01/08 7:43 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Heather Wilson.(Morrison, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit - Exhibits 1-11
Wednesday, December 27, 2017
20 20 order Scheduling Order Wed 12/27 8:48 AM
RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: All Discovery due by 10/19/2018. Dispositive motions due by 12/14/2018. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 12/22/17. (CLB)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2017
19 19 order Vacate Hearing Fri 12/22 10:21 AM
IT IS ORDERED the Rule 16 Case Management Conference, presently set for 1/3/2018 before Judge Steven P. Logan is VACATED. Order to issue. Ordered by Judge Steven P. Logan. (SPL, jm) ( This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2017
18 18 misc Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP Thu 12/21 1:49 PM
Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff David Sellers.(Witko, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Thu 12/21 11:15 AM
ORDER denying16 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the parties Joint Rule 26(f) Case Management Report and Joint Proposed Rule 16 Case Management Order shall be filed no later than December 28, 2017. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 12/20/17. (CLB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2017
16 16 motion Continue Tue 12/19 9:36 AM
First MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Heather Wilson.(Morrison, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, December 15, 2017
15 15 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/15 3:44 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Rubin, Michael)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/15 3:42 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Lockheed Martin Corporation.(Rubin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2017
misc Remark (Public) Thu 11/30 8:56 AM
Remark: Pro hac vice motions granted for Meghan Meade and Rosemary Alito on behalf of defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
misc Remark (Public) Thu 11/30 1:26 PM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Andrew M Witko on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2017
13 13 service Service Executed Mon 11/27 5:50 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by David Sellers: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Consent to Exercise Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge, Notice to Parties-Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project upon The Honorable Heather Wilson on 11/7/17. (King, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
12 12 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 11/22 4:57 PM
ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 1/3/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P Logan. The parties are directed to meet and confer no later than fourteen (14) days prior to the Case Management Conference as required by Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 11/22/2017.(MMO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Case Management Order
Tuesday, November 21, 2017
11 11 7 pgs order Order re Rule 12(b) Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 11/21 3:03 PM
PRELIMINARY ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on January 4, 2018, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 11/21/17.(CLB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Thursday, November 16, 2017
10 10 service Service Executed Thu 11/16 11:27 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by David Sellers: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 10/16/2017 to Lockheed Martin Corporation . (King, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2017
9 9 minute_ord Minute Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges ~Util - Terminate Hearings Tue 11/14 3:49 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Steven P. Logan. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 17-3586 PHX-SPL. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for December 11, 2017 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc 25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge Tue 11/14 3:47 PM
Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs misc 25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause (LRCiv 3.7(b)) Tue 11/14 9:06 AM
Order that David Sellers show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 12/11/2017 at 08:45 AM before Judge G Murray Snow.(MAP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Instructions,
Att: 2 Consent Form
Friday, October 06, 2017
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 10/06 4:42 PM
Summons Issued as to Lockheed Martin Corporation, Heather Wilson.(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
4 4 notice Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Fri 10/06 4:40 PM
NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (REK)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc New Case Opened Fri 10/06 4:40 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14733102. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M. Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 17-03586 PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. (REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
2 2 service Summons Submitted Fri 10/06 4:38 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by David Sellers. (submitted by William King) (REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/06 4:37 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-14733102 filed by David Sellers. (submitted by William King) (REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet