Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-74078

New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Louis A Scarcella
Case #: 8:17-ap-08266
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Oct 09, 2017
Terminated:Dec 21, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Steve Weinstock
5 Glenwood Lane
Roslyn Heights, NY 11577
Represented By
Steve Weinstock
contact info
Plaintiff
Clifford Stern
40 Meadow Lake Drive
Mahwah, NJ 07430
Represented By
Robert H Solomon
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, December 21, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Thu 12/21 8:29 AM
Adversary Case 8:17-ap-8266 Closed (cam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2017
13 13 order Generic Order Wed 12/06 2:19 PM
Order Approving the Stipulation setting the adversar Related [+]. Signed on 12/6/2017 (cam)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of Proposed Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Clifford Stern
Thursday, November 30, 2017
12 12 notice Notice of Proposed Stipulation Thu 11/30 2:28 PM
Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between Clifford Stern and Steven Weinstock to Settlement of Adversary Proceeding to make $275,000.00 of the debt non-dischargable Filed by Clifford Stern Related [+]. (Solomon, Robert)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, November 28, 2017
11 11 misc Letter Tue 11/28 3:29 PM
Letter re Status of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Robert H Solomon on behalf of Clifford Stern Related [+] (Solomon, Robert)
Related: [-] 5 Scheduling Order
Monday, November 06, 2017
10 10 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Mon 11/06 3:53 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service on Steven Weinstock Filed by Robert H Solomon on behalf of Clifford Stern Related [+] (Solomon, Robert)
Related: [-] 5 Scheduling Order
Tuesday, October 24, 2017
9 9 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 10/24 4:34 PM
Summons Served on Steve Weinstock 10/24/2017 . (Solomon, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2017
8 8 misc Letter Wed 10/18 4:51 PM
Letter Correcting Address of Clifford Stern from 40 Meadow Lake Drive Mahwah, NJ 07430 to 49 Meadow Lake Drive Mahwah, NJ 07430 Filed by Robert H Solomon on behalf of Clifford Stern Related [+] (Solomon, Robert)
Related: [-] 7 Notice of Change of Address filed by Plaintiff Clifford Stern
7 7 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 10/18 4:40 PM
Notice of Change of Address of Clifford Stern from 40 Meadow Lake Drive Mahwah, NJ 07430 to 49 Meadow Lake Drive Mahwah, NJ 07430. Filed by Robert H Solomon on behalf of Clifford Stern (Solomon, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2017
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Sat 10/14 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 10/13/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2017
5 5 order Scheduling Order Wed 10/11 4:01 PM
Order Setting Pretrial Conference Related [+]. Signed on 10/11/2017. Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/7/2017 at 10:15 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. (amp)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Clifford Stern
Tuesday, October 10, 2017
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 10/10 4:05 PM
Summons Served on Clifford Stern 10/10/2017 . (Solomon, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Tue 10/10 1:08 PM
Incorrect Event used - Attorney refiled - Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Robert H Solomon on behalf of Clifford Stern Related [+] (Solomon, Robert) Modified on 10/11/2017 (amp)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Clifford Stern,2 Summons In An Adversary Proceeding (Judge Trust and Judge Scarcella) (Auto)
2 2 cmp Summons In An Adversary Proceeding (Judge Trust and Judge Scarcella) (Auto) Tue 10/10 11:57 AM
Summons In An Adversary Proceeding Issued by Clerk's Office against Steve Weinstock Answer Due: 11/9/2017 (amp)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/09 9:48 AM
Adversary case 8 17-08266 Complaint by Clifford Stern against Steve Weinstock. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)), (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)), (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)). (Solomon, Robert)
Related: [-]