Schmidt v. The Grand Ltd
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:15-bk-34287
Lead BK case is: 4:15-bk-34287
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:17-ap-03412 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Oct 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 08, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
The Grand Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard S. Schmidt
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jul 30 2019
Memorandum Opinion, Signed on 7/30/2019 (Related document(s):32 Motion for Summary Judgment, 33 Motion for Summary Judgment) (LinhthuDo) |
Docket last updated: 37 minutes ago |
Friday, March 08, 2024 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 03/08 3:47 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3412 Closed. (TylerLaws) |