Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Barbara M G Lynn
Case #: 3:17-cv-02784
Nature of Suit196 Contract - Franchise
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Oct 10, 2017
Terminated:Feb 13, 2018
Last checked: Sunday Apr 08, 2018 3:23 AM CDT
Defendant
Narain Gulabani
Defendant
Sweta Gulabani
Plaintiff
La Quinta Franchising LLC
Represented By
Allison F Jacobsen
Hunton & Williams LLP
contact info
John T Gerhart
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Bolingbrook Hospitality
Terminated: 11/20/2017


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, October 05, 2020
33 33 misc Satisfaction of Judgment Mon 10/05 2:59 PM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT filed by La Quinta Franchising LLC. (Noordsy, Michael)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Satisfaction of Judgment Mon 10/05 2:58 PM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT filed by La Quinta Franchising LLC. (Noordsy, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2018
31 31 order Judgment - Default Tue 02/13 4:57 PM
FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff La Quinta Franchising LLC and against Defendant Bolingbrook Hospitality for damages totaling $245,594.29, together with attorneys' fees in the amount of $6,472.60. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/13/2018) (axm)
Related: [-]
30 30 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Tue 02/13 4:53 PM
ORDER granting28 Amended Motion for Final Default Judgment. The Court ORDERS that Defendants Narain Gulabani and Sweta Gulabani are in default. A Final Default Judgment consistent with this Order is being rendered on this date. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/13/2018) (axm)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2018
29 29 misc Supplemental Document Mon 02/12 4:09 PM
Supplemental Document by La Quinta Franchising LLC Affidavit of John T. Gerhart ISO First Amended Motion for Final Judgment . (Gerhart, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A
Friday, February 02, 2018
28 28 motion Default Judgment Fri 02/02 4:31 PM
Amended MOTION for Default Judgment against Narain Gulabani, Sweta Gulabani filed by La Quinta Franchising LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Gerhart, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B
Thursday, February 01, 2018
27 27 misc Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 02/01 3:43 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Narain Gulabani, Sweta Gulabani. (zkc)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Thu 02/01 2:11 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Entry of Default Against Defendants Narain and Sweta Gulabani filed by La Quinta Franchising LLC. (Gerhart, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
25 25 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Thu 02/01 12:36 PM
***Please Disregard-atty to refile with corrected document*** Request for Clerk to issue Request for Entry of Default Against Defendants Narain and Sweta Gulabani filed by La Quinta Franchising LLC. (Gerhart, John) Modified on 2/1/2018 (epm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 30, 2018
24 24 motion Default Judgment Tue 01/30 3:38 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against Narain Gulabani, Sweta Gulabani filed by La Quinta Franchising LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Gerhart, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Final Default Judgment
Monday, January 22, 2018
23 23 misc Affidavit Mon 01/22 12:05 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Kelly Allen Regarding Attempted Substituted Service by CM/RRR by La Quinta Franchising LLC. (Flood, Laurie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2017
22 22 misc Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 12/28 3:18 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Narain Gulabani, Sweta Gulabani. (ndt)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Thu 12/28 2:39 PM
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to19 Request for Clerk to Issue Document by Plaintiff La Quinta Franchising LLC. (Gerhart, John)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Summons Returned Thu 12/28 2:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. (ndt)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Thu 12/28 12:42 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Default filed by La Quinta Franchising LLC. (Gerhart, John) Modified on 12/28/2017 Related [+]
Related: [-] kc
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A ( DISREGARD ATTACHMENT 1 - ATTY TO REFILE ),
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, December 21, 2017
18 18 misc Affidavit Thu 12/21 4:18 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Process Server regarding Narain Gulabani by La Quinta Franchising LLC. (Jacobsen, Allison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachments
17 17 misc Affidavit Thu 12/21 4:16 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Process Server regarding Sweta Gulabani by La Quinta Franchising LLC. (Jacobsen, Allison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachments
16 16 misc Affidavit Thu 12/21 4:12 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Kelly Allen Regarding Attempted Substituted Service by Certified Mail, Return Receipt Requested by La Quinta Franchising LLC. (Jacobsen, Allison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits 1-3
Thursday, December 14, 2017
15 15 service Summons Returned Thu 12/14 11:41 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Sweta Gulabani ; served on 12/6/2017. (Gerhart, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
14 14 service Summons Returned Thu 12/14 11:39 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Narain Gulabani ; served on 12/6/2017. (Gerhart, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 summons
Tuesday, November 28, 2017
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 11/28 3:49 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion to allow La Quinta to effectuate substituted service on Defendants. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 11/28/2017) (ran)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2017
12 12 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 11/27 5:21 PM
MOTION to allow La Quinta to effectuate substituted service on Defendants filed by La Quinta Franchising LLC (Gerhart, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A B & C,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, November 20, 2017
11 11 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer Tue 11/21 8:28 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall file a written response to this Order on or before 11/27/2017. If Plaintiff fails to respond, of if the response fails to demonstrate good cause for failing to effect service on Narain and Sweta Gulabani the Court will dismiss Plaintiff's claims against these defendants without prejudice. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 11/20/2017) (sss)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Judgment - Default Tue 11/21 8:26 AM
FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT: La Quinta shall recover from Bolingbrook damages in the amount of $245,594.29, together with attorneys' fees in the amount of $6,472.60. The total damages amount shall bear interest at the rate prescribed by 28 U.S.C. § 1961, and shall be enforceable as prescribed by Rule 69(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, for which let execution issue. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 11/20/2017) (sss)
Related: [-]
9 9 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Tue 11/21 8:25 AM
ORDER: Before the Court is a Motion for Final Default Judgment [ECF #8 ], filed by Plaintiff La Quinta Franchising LLC. The Motion is GRANTED. Defendant is in default, and that default judgment be, and is hereby, entered against Defendant consistent with the provisions of this Order. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 11/20/2017) (sss)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2017
8 8 motion Default Judgment Thu 11/16 6:42 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against Bolingbrook Hospitality filed by La Quinta Franchising LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Gerhart, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, November 13, 2017
7 7 misc Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 11/13 4:15 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Bolingbrook Hospitality. (ams)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Mon 11/13 2:58 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Default against Defendant Bolingbrook Hospitality filed by La Quinta Franchising LLC. (Jacobsen, Allison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 19, 2017
5 5 service Summons Returned Thu 10/19 5:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Bolingbrook Hospitality ; served on 10/13/2017. (Gerhart, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2017
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 10/10 4:19 PM
Summons Issued as to Bolingbrook Hospitality, Narain Gulabani, Sweta Gulabani. (ndt)
Related: [-]
3 3 qcref Lynn Tue 10/10 4:16 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Tue 10/10 3:25 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by La Quinta Franchising LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Lodge Holdco II L.L.C., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate La Quinta Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate La Quinta Intermediate Holdings L.L.C. for La Quinta Franchising LLC. (Gerhart, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/10 3:16 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by La Quinta Franchising LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8727725) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Gerhart, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) C