Original Case: 2:10-cv-02593

Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:14-cv-05052
Typecivil / private / federal question
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2014
Terminated:Jan 30, 2014
Last checked: Saturday Feb 08, 2014 12:24 AM CST
Defendant - Appellee
CITY OF MEMPHIS, TENNESSEE
Represented By
Jill M. Madajczyk
Memphis City Attorney's Office
contact info
Linda Nettles Harris
Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MICHAEL ALBERSON, JR.
Represented By
John Ford Canale III
Law Offices
contact info
Thomas A. Woodley
Woodley & McGillivary
contact info
Sara L. Faulman
Woodley & McGillivary
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARTINAS ANDREWS
Plaintiff - Appellant
MYRON D. APPLEWHITE
Plaintiff - Appellant
AARON ATKINS
Plaintiff - Appellant
BRANDON BADGETT
Plaintiff - Appellant
TERRANCE BARRAS
Plaintiff - Appellant
LONNIE L. BIVINS
Plaintiff - Appellant
PAUL L. BLUM
Plaintiff - Appellant
TROY BROWN
Plaintiff - Appellant
BEAU B. BROWNING
Plaintiff - Appellant
TROY BUDDE
Plaintiff - Appellant
LANCE BUTLER
Plaintiff - Appellant
JASON CACCAMISI
Plaintiff - Appellant
TERRANCE CALLICUTT
Plaintiff - Appellant
MICHAEL C. CLEMENT
Plaintiff - Appellant
JASON L. COLE
Plaintiff - Appellant
CHRISTOPHER HORVATH
Plaintiff - Appellant
AUBREY HUBBARD
Plaintiff - Appellant
JERRY HUNT
Plaintiff - Appellant
CHRIS JOHNSON
Plaintiff - Appellant
KENDRICK K. JOHNSON
Plaintiff - Appellant
SHERMAN LANGSTON
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARC A. LEONTI
Plaintiff - Appellant
CHENYILU LEWIS
Plaintiff - Appellant
CHARLES LESLIE
Plaintiff - Appellant
JACOB LOCKWOOD
Plaintiff - Appellant
CHAD LONG
Plaintiff - Appellant
ROBERT LUCAS
Plaintiff - Appellant
JUSTIN LUTTRELL
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOSHUA A. MACKLING
Plaintiff - Appellant
JAMES MARTIN
Plaintiff - Appellant
STEPHEN MCDANIEL
Plaintiff - Appellant
RODGER L. MCGEE
Plaintiff - Appellant
DANIEL MINOR
Plaintiff - Appellant
ANTHONY PACCASASSI
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOSEPH W. PALUGI
Plaintiff - Appellant
BOBBY L. PEACOCK, JR.
Plaintiff - Appellant
KYLE PORTER
Plaintiff - Appellant
MALCOLM A. ROBINSON
Plaintiff - Appellant
THERON ROBINSON
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARQUETTE ROOKS
Plaintiff - Appellant
LEWIS D. ROOSER
Plaintiff - Appellant
PATRICK T. ROWLAND
Plaintiff - Appellant
COLBY RUPLE
Plaintiff - Appellant
BOBBY E. RUSSELL, III
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOSHUA R. RUSSELL
Plaintiff - Appellant
LESTER LEON RUSSELL
Plaintiff - Appellant
ROBERT J. SHINHOLT
Plaintiff - Appellant
DAVID SCHLAUCH
Plaintiff - Appellant
DAMON J. SMITH
Plaintiff - Appellant
JEREMY SMITH
Plaintiff - Appellant
RYAN PERRY SMITH
Plaintiff - Appellant
TERMAINE SNYDER
Plaintiff - Appellant
GERALD SPENCER
Plaintiff - Appellant
MATTHEW STATEN
Plaintiff - Appellant
MICHAEL SWAIN
Plaintiff - Appellant
THOMAS J. TAYLOR, JR.
Plaintiff - Appellant
CHAD TILL
Plaintiff - Appellant
MICHAEL A. WALDEN, JR.
Plaintiff - Appellant
ERICA DENISE WARREN
Plaintiff - Appellant
MICHAEL WEBB
Plaintiff - Appellant
CHRISTOPHER C. ROBINSON
Plaintiff - Appellant
VISHAWN COLE
Plaintiff - Appellant
MORRECO COLEMAN
Plaintiff - Appellant
ALLEN G. CRAFT, SR.
Plaintiff - Appellant
ANTONIO CRAWFORD
Plaintiff - Appellant
DERRICK DELANCEY
Plaintiff - Appellant
WELDON L. FOUST
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARCUS GAINES
Plaintiff - Appellant
ADRIAN GARDNER
Plaintiff - Appellant
HUGH GARNER
Plaintiff - Appellant
CURTIS L. GOTT
Plaintiff - Appellant
ERIC N. GAY
Plaintiff - Appellant
KEVIN GRAY
Plaintiff - Appellant
LEE GREGORY
Plaintiff - Appellant
CHANCE A. HALL
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARQUARIUS HAMPTON
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARLON HARRIS
Plaintiff - Appellant
JAMES M. HARROLD
Plaintiff - Appellant
JORDAN C. HART
Plaintiff - Appellant
WILLIAM B. HART
Plaintiff - Appellant
BENJAMIN HAZLERIG
Plaintiff - Appellant
MATTHEW A. HERNDON
Plaintiff - Appellant
WILLIAM K. HILL
Plaintiff - Appellant
ANTHONY D. HILLIARD
Plaintiff - Appellant
WILLIE HOLMAN
Plaintiff - Appellant
JACOB L. HONSHELL
Plaintiff - Appellant
JAMES A. WEIDNER
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOHN C. WHITE, III
Plaintiff - Appellant
NICHOLAS WILLIAMS
Plaintiff - Appellant
ROBERT WILLIS
Plaintiff - Appellant
BRYAN WILSON
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOSEPH WOODFORK, III
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARLON M. ZANDERS
Plaintiff - Appellant
JASON W. BRADY
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARK CATHEY
Plaintiff - Appellant
KAREEM COLLIER
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARQUS COWAN
Plaintiff - Appellant
JAMES DOWELL
Plaintiff - Appellant
TRAVIS DUCKING
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOHN R. GRICE, SR.
Plaintiff - Appellant
COREY IRBY
Plaintiff - Appellant
JAKUMA NTI JOHNSON
Plaintiff - Appellant
ANTHONY JONES
Plaintiff - Appellant
CARLOS NORTHCROSS
Plaintiff - Appellant
PETER PANOS
Plaintiff - Appellant
ANDRE PLUMMER
Plaintiff - Appellant
RANDY J. REED
Plaintiff - Appellant
BRENT C. SAWYER
Plaintiff - Appellant
SYLVESTER TAYLOR
Plaintiff - Appellant
JASON TUNSTALL
Plaintiff - Appellant
STEVEN A. WHITE
Plaintiff - Appellant
ANDREA WILLIS
Plaintiff - Appellant
LEON WILLIS
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOSHUA WOOD
Plaintiff - Appellant
QUINTENCE YOUNG
Plaintiff - Appellant
JON MISEWICZ


Docket last updated: 02/08/2014 12:24 AM CST
Thursday, January 16, 2014
The case manager for this case is: Linda Niesen (LMN)
Related: [-]
Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Jon Misewicz, et al. Transcript needed: y.--[Edited 01/28/2014 by LMN] (LMN)
Related: [-]