Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:17-bk-52170

Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Alan M Koschik
Case #: 5:17-ap-05072
Nature of Suit91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Oct 12, 2017
Terminated:Dec 27, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Data Cooling Technologies LLC
1777 Miller Parkway
Streetsboro, OH 44241
Represented By
Data Cooling Technologies LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KyotoCooling North America LLC
14160 Dallas Parkway, Suite 410
Dallas, TX 75254
Represented By
Daniel A. DeMarco
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, January 01, 2018
court ADI Returned Mail Mon 01/01 8:30 AM
Returned Mail: Mail originally sent on 11/17/2017 returned as undeliverable. Could not mail Form pdf810 to: KyotoCooling North America LLC 14160 Dallas Parkway, Suite 410 Dallas, TX 75254-4362. (ADIrm adi)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 30, 2017
court ADI Returned Mail Mon 01/01 8:30 AM
Returned Mail: Mail originally sent on 11/17/2017 returned as undeliverable. Could not mail Form pdf810 to: KyotoCooling North America LLC 14160 Dallas Parkway, Suite 410 Dallas, TX 75254-4362. (ADIrm adi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Wed 12/27 11:56 AM
Adversary Case 5:17-ap-5072 Closed (spete)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2017
20 20 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Tue 12/19 11:00 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by KyotoCooling North America LLC. (DeMarco, Daniel aty)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Not Held - CHAP ADI Tue 12/19 2:12 PM
Hearing set for 12/20/2017 not necessary, notice of dismissal of adversary filed -- Related [+] (mknot)
Related: [-] 17 Generic Motion filed by Data Cooling Technologies LLC
Thursday, December 07, 2017
19 19 BNC Notice of Order on Generic Order Fri 12/08 12:23 AM
Notice of Order on Generic Order w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/07/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18
Tuesday, December 05, 2017
18 18 order Generic Order (PDF) Tue 12/05 12:35 PM
AGREED ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE JOINT MOTION OF DATA COOLING TECHNOLOGIES LLC AND KYOTOCOOLING NORTH AMERICA LLC FOR AN ORDER (I) EXTENDING THE DEADLINE TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT FROM DECEMBER 11, 2017 THROUGH AND INCLUDING DECEMBER 29, 2017 AND (II) GRANTING RELATED RELIEF, INCLUDING HOLDING RELATED PROCEEDINGS IN ABEYANCE UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT Related [+] Signed on 12/5/2017. (spete crt)
Related: [-] 17
17 17 motion Generic Motion Tue 12/05 9:55 AM
Motion Ex Parte Joint Motion of Data Cooling Technologies LLC and KyotoCooling North America LLC for an Order (i) Extending the Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint from December 11, 2017 Through and Including December 29, 2017 and (ii) Holding Certain Other Proceedings in Abeyance Until Further Order of the Court Filed by Defendant Data Cooling Technologies LLC (Malloy, Sean aty)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched No Notice Tue 12/05 1:37 PM
Hearing Scheduled, Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 12/20/2017 at 11:00 AM at 260 Fed Bldg Akron. (mknot)
Related: [-] 17 Generic Motion
Tuesday, November 28, 2017
court Hearing Not Held - CHAP ADI Tue 11/28 4:54 PM
Pretrial Hearing to be held in abeyance per agreed order extending deadlines15 Related [+] (mknot)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by KyotoCooling North America LLC
Sunday, November 19, 2017
court ADI Returned Mail Mon 11/20 8:30 AM
Returned Mail: Mail originally sent on 10/15/2017 returned as undeliverable. Could not mail Form pdf884 to: KyotoCooling North America LLC 14160 Dallas Parkway, Suite 410 Dallas, TX 75254-4362. (ADIrm adi)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2017
16 16 BNC Notice of Order on Generic Order Sat 11/18 12:24 AM
Notice of Order on Generic Order w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 11/17/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15
court ADI Returned Mail Mon 11/20 8:30 AM
Returned Mail: Mail originally sent on 10/15/2017 returned as undeliverable. Could not mail Form pdf884 to: KyotoCooling North America LLC 14160 Dallas Parkway, Suite 410 Dallas, TX 75254-4362. (ADIrm adi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2017
15 15 order Generic Order (PDF) Wed 11/15 7:53 AM
AGREED ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE JOINT MOTION OF DATA COOLING TECHNOLOGIES LLC AND KYOTOCOOLING NORTH AMERICA LLC FOR AN ORDER (I) EXTENDING THE DEADLINE TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT FROM NOVEMBER 13, 2017 THROUGH AND INCLUDING DECEMBER 11, 2017 AND (II) HOLDING CERTAIN OTHER PROCEEDINGS IN ABEYANCE UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT Related [+] Signed on 11/14/2017. (spete crt)
Related: [-] 14 Ex Parte Motion
Monday, November 13, 2017
14 14 motion Generic Motion Mon 11/13 5:17 PM
Ex Parte Motion Ex Parte Joint Motion of Data Cooling Technologies LLC and KyotoCooling North America LLC for an Order (i) Extending the Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint from November 13, 2017 Through and Including December 11, 2017 and (ii) Holding Certain Other Proceedings in Abeyance Until Further Order of the Court Filed by Data Cooling Technologies LLC (Malloy, Sean aty)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, November 03, 2017
13 13 notice Notice of Motion Fri 11/03 5:30 PM
Notice of Motion Filed by Defendant Data Cooling Technologies LLC Related [+]. (Malloy, Sean aty)
Related: [-] 12 Motion Motion of Defendant Data Cooling Technologies LLC to Strike Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Motion to Deny or Stay Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Rule 56(d) Filed by Data Cooling Technologies LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Malloy, Sean aty)
12 12 motion Generic Motion Fri 11/03 5:28 PM
Motion Motion of Defendant Data Cooling Technologies LLC to Strike Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Motion to Deny or Stay Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Rule 56(d) Filed by Data Cooling Technologies LLC (Malloy, Sean aty)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, October 27, 2017
11 11 notice Notice of Motion Fri 10/27 9:29 AM
Notice of Motion Notice of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment with Memorandum of Law in Support Filed by KyotoCooling North America LLC Related [+]. (DeMarco, Daniel aty)
Related: [-] 10 Motion For Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment with Memorandum of Law in Support Filed by KyotoCooling North America LLC (DeMarco, Daniel aty) filed by Plaintiff KyotoCooling North America LLC
10 10 motion Summary Judgment Fri 10/27 9:24 AM
Motion For Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment with Memorandum of Law in Support Filed by KyotoCooling North America LLC (DeMarco, Daniel aty)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 10/27 8:48 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Maria Carr Filed by Defendant Data Cooling Technologies LLC. (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 10/27 8:46 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Michael J. Kaczka Filed by Defendant Data Cooling Technologies LLC. (Kaczka, Michael aty)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 10/27 8:44 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Sean D. Malloy Filed by Defendant Data Cooling Technologies LLC. (Malloy, Sean aty)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2017
6 6 motion Seal Thu 10/26 3:03 PM
Motion to Seal Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (A) the License Agreement, and (B) Other Confidential Materials in Connection with Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by KyotoCooling North America LLC (DeMarco, Daniel aty)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 15, 2017
5 5 BNC Notice of Order on Pre-Trial Mon 10/16 12:20 AM
Notice of Order on Pre-Trial w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/15/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4
Friday, October 13, 2017
4 4 order Relative to Pre-Trial (PDF) Fri 10/13 10:49 AM
Order Relative to Pre-Trial Signed on 10/13/2017 Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 11/29/2017 at 02:30 PM at 260 Fed Bldg Akron. (mknot crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Fri 10/13 10:42 AM
Summons issued on Plaintiff for service on Defendant(s) Data Cooling Technologies LLC Answer due 11/13/2017. This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the summons in an adversary proceeding. The attached summons has been sealed, processed, and docketed by the Clerk. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of the summons will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a) and F.R.C.P. 4, it is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to promptly serve the summons, a copy of the complaint, and, if applicable, a copy of any pre-trial or adversary case management order on defendant(s). To be timely, the summons and a copy of the complaint must be served within seven (7) days of issuance per Bankruptcy Rule 7004(e). Service of the summons is prescribed by Bankruptcy Rule 7004 and F.R.C.P. 4. If a summons is not timely served, an ''alias'' summons must be requested from the Clerk. Certification or proof of service by plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is made by completing the Certificate of Service portion of the original summons. Attorneys should docket the summons, once served, using the Summons Service Executed event within CM/ECF. Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/29/2017 at 02:30 PM at 260 Fed Bldg Akron. (mknot)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff KyotoCooling North America LLC
Thursday, October 12, 2017
2 2 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Thu 10/12 6:48 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by KyotoCooling North America LLC Related [+]. (DeMarco, Daniel aty)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/12 6:42 PM
Adversary case 17-05072 Complaint by KyotoCooling North America LLC against Data Cooling Technologies LLC. Fee Amount $350 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment Nature of Suit:91 (Declaratory Judgement Rule 7001(9)) (DeMarco, Daniel aty)
Related: [-]