Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:14-bk-07074

Tennessee Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Marian F Harrison
Case #: 3:17-ap-90253
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Oct 13, 2017
Terminated:Nov 16, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
SHAPIRO & INGLE LLP
ATTORNEY FOR 10130 PERIMETER PKWY SUITE 400
CHARLOTTE, NC 28216
Represented By
SHAPIRO & INGLE LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL GIGANDET
LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL GIGANDET 208 CENTRE ST
PLEASANT VIEW, TN 37146
Represented By
MICHAEL GIGANDET
Law Office Of Michael Gigandet
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, March 13, 2018
9 9 court Receipt of Filing Fee(OTC auto) Tue 03/13 7:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by JD. Receipt Number 00617950. (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 08, 2018
8 8 court Bill of Costs Thu 03/08 12:30 PM
Bill of Costs - MICHAEL GIGANDET - $ 350.00 - ADVERSARY PROCEEDING FILING FEE Related [+] (dm)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, November 16, 2017
7 7 court Close Adversary Case Thu 11/16 9:54 AM
Adversary Case 3:17-ap-90253 Closed . (rmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2017
6 6 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding - AP Order (SA) Thu 10/26 7:22 AM
Notice and Stipulation/Order of Non-Suit; Order Granting Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with prejudice Related [+]. Signed on 10/26/2017. (rmw)
Related: [-] Related Doc#:1
Wednesday, October 25, 2017
5 5 misc Submitted Order Wed 10/25 11:13 AM
Submitted Order of nonsuit Filed on the behalf of: Plaintiff MICHAEL GIGANDET Related [+]. (GIGANDET, MICHAEL)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, October 18, 2017
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Wed 10/18 9:08 AM
Certificate of Service mailed on 10/18/17 Certificate of Service Mailed on 10/18/17.. (GIGANDET, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2017
3 3 court Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conf Mon 10/16 5:51 PM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service on SHAPIRO & INGLE LLP Pretrial Conference scheduled 12/13/2017 at 01:15 PM at Courtroom 3, 2nd Floor Customs House, 701 Broadway, Nashville, TN 37203. Case judge is Marian F Harrison. Related [+]. (ccm)
Related: [-] related documents1 Complaint
Friday, October 13, 2017
2 2 trustee Affidavit to Defer Filing Fee Fri 10/13 11:16 AM
Trustee's Affidavit to Defer Payment of Filing Fee. (GIGANDET, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/13 11:12 AM
Adversary case 3:17-ap-90253. Complaint by MICHAEL GIGANDET against SHAPIRO & INGLE LLP. Fee Amount is $350.00. Filed By Trustee, Fees will be deferred. MICHAEL GIGANDET. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) (GIGANDET, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]