Member Case
Lead case is: 3:17-bk-07036

Tennessee Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Charles M Walker
Case #: 3:17-bk-07055
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2017
Dismissed:Dec 04, 2020
Terminated:Dec 28, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Auto Masters of West Nashville, LLC
5501 Charlotte Pike
Nashville, TN 37209-3210
Represented By
GRIFFIN S DUNHAM
Dunham Hildebrand, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEE 701 BROADWAY STE 318
NASHVILLE, TN 37203
Represented By
NATALIE M. COX
Us Dept Of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 12:03 PM CDT
Monday, December 28, 2020
37 37 order Final Decree Chapter 11 Mon 12/28 1:50 PM
Final Decree Issued. Chapter 11 case is closed. IT IS ORDERED that the trustee, if one was appointed, is discharged as trustee of this estate. Signed on 12/28/2020. (kmw)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 06, 2020
36 36 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 12/06 11:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 12/06/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 35 Order Dismissing Case - BK Order (SA)
Friday, December 04, 2020
35 35 order Dismiss Case (Granting) - BK Order (SA) Fri 12/04 12:59 PM
Order Granting Debtor's Joint Motion to Authorize Distribution of Funds and Order Dismissing Case for Debtor Auto Masters of West Nashville, LLC. Signed on 12/4/2020. (taa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2019
34 34 virtual Docket Order CHAP - Continue Hearing (Auto) Tue 12/17 12:12 PM
Order Continuing Hearing Re: Related [+] Hearing has been rescheduled for 01/28/2020 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom 2, 2nd Floor Customs House, 701 Broadway, Nashville, TN 37203. (lel)
Related: [-] 31 Response filed by TN Dept of Revenue, 32 Hearing Set (Bk Motion)
Tuesday, November 12, 2019
33 33 virtual Docket Order CHAP - Continue Hearing (Auto) Wed 11/13 10:32 AM
Order Continuing Hearing Re: Related [+] Hearing has been rescheduled for 12/17/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 2nd Floor Customs House, 701 Broadway, Nashville, TN 37203. (lel)
Related: [-] 30 Motion and Notice to Disallow Claim - BK Motion filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors,31 Response filed by TN Dept of Revenue, 32 Hearing Set (Bk Motion)
Monday, November 04, 2019
32 32 court Hearing Set (Virtual Entry) Mon 11/04 10:04 AM
Hearing Set - Related [+] Creditor - Tennessee Department of Revenue Response to Joint First Omnibus Objection to Claims. Filed on the behalf of: Creditor TN Dept of Revenue. Hearing scheduled 11/12/2019 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 2, 2nd Floor Customs House, 701 Broadway, Nashville, TN 37203. (lel)
Related: [-] sponse31 Response
Thursday, October 31, 2019
31 31 answer Response Thu 10/31 4:09 PM
Creditor - Tennessee Department of Revenue Response to Joint First Omnibus Objection to Claims . Filed on the behalf of: Creditor TN Dept of Revenue. (MCCORMICK, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2019
30 30 motion Disallow Claim(s) - BK Motion Tue 10/01 3:18 PM
Joint First Omnibus Objection to Claims Not Timely Filed and Notice Motion and Notice to Disallow Claim(s)# 9,10 . If timely response hearing will be held on 11/12/2019 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 2, 2nd Floor Customs House, 701 Broadway, Nashville, TN 37203. Responses due by 10/31/2019. Certificate of Service mailed on 10/1/2019. Filed on the behalf of: Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (FORRESTER, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 17, 2018
29 29 misc Operating Report Tue 04/17 11:21 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period (Month Ending)March 31, 2018 Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Auto Masters of West Nashville, LLC. (Payne, R.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 29, 2018
28 28 misc Operating Report Thu 03/29 10:30 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period (Month Ending) February 2018 Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Auto Masters of West Nashville, LLC. (DUNHAM, GRIFFIN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2018
27 27 misc Operating Report Tue 02/20 4:59 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period (Month Ending)January 31, 2018 Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Auto Masters of West Nashville, LLC. (Payne, R.)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2017
26 26 court Clerk's Remark - Name and Case Fri 12/15 1:55 PM
Clerk's Remark - The Debtor(s)/Party name(s) and the case number do not agree with the record of this case. Related [+] (jlm)
Related: [-] 23 Debtor's Verified and Amended Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Auto Masters of West Nashville, LLC (Payne, R.)
Thursday, December 14, 2017
25 25 misc Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules Thu 12/14 4:51 PM
Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Auto Masters of West Nashville, LLC Related [+]. (Payne, R.)
Related: [-] 21
24 24 misc 1 - Statement of Financial Affairs Thu 12/14 4:50 PM
Debtor's Verified and Amended Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Auto Masters of West Nashville, LLC (Payne, R.)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc 1 - Statement of Financial Affairs Thu 12/14 4:49 PM
Debtor's Verified and Amended Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Auto Masters of West Nashville, LLC (Payne, R.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2017
court Meeting of Creditors Continued Wed 11/15 10:01 AM
Meeting of Creditors Continued - Debtor(s) Counsel shall file Certificate of Service for all creditors who have not supplied an email address to the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court. Meeting of Creditors will be conducted in Room 142 for all of the consolidated cases. Meeting of Creditors to be held on 12/19/2017 at 01:00 PM at Customs House, 701 Broadway, Room 100, Nashville, TN 37203. (US TRUSTEE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2017
22 22 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Tue 11/07 10:20 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders as Amended Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Auto Masters of West Nashville, LLC Related [+]. (Payne, R.)
Related: [-] 4
21 21 misc 2 - Original Schedules Tue 11/07 10:20 PM
Original Schedule(s) Schedule A/B,Schedule C,Schedule D,Schedule E/F,Schedule G,Schedule H, Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Auto Masters of West Nashville, LLC (Payne, R.)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc 1 - Statement of Financial Affairs Tue 11/07 10:19 PM
Initial Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Auto Masters of West Nashville, LLC (Payne, R.)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 22, 2017
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Notice Mon 10/23 12:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 10/22/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order
Friday, October 20, 2017
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 10/21 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 10/20/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order Setting Expedited Hearing
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 10/21 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 10/20/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Thursday, October 19, 2017
16 16 3 pgs order Order Thu 10/19 6:56 PM
Order Granting Expedited Motion for Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. All future pleadings will be filed in the lead case 17-07036 Signed on 10/19/2017. (klp)
Related: [-]
15 15 answer Objection Thu 10/19 1:02 PM
Objection to Expedited Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral, Granting Adequate Protection and Scheduling Final Hearing . Filed on the behalf of: Creditor CAPITAL ONE Related [+]. (COOK, CHARLES)
Related: [-] 11
Att: 1 Exhibit Collateral Description
Att: 2 Exhibit Borrowing Base 1
Att: 3 Exhibit Borrowing Base 2
misc (Blue Tag) Email Judge Walker of Late Filed Matter Thu 10/19 1:02 PM
Email Judge Charles M. Walker of Late Filed Matter. Objection Filed on the behalf of: U.S. Trustee US TRUSTEE Related [+]. (COOK, CHARLES)
Related: [-] 15
Wednesday, October 18, 2017
14 14 motion Appear pro hac vice - BK Motion Wed 10/18 6:31 PM
Motion for to Appear pro hac vice. Filed on the behalf of: Creditor AUTOMOTIVE FINANCE CORPORATION. (CHEADLE, DUDLEY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit DECLARATION
Att: 2 Proposed Order
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service - BK Notice Wed 10/18 6:29 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service pursuant to Rule 2002 Filed on the behalf of: Creditor AUTOMOTIVE FINANCE CORPORATION. (CHEADLE, DUDLEY)
Related: [-]
12 12 court Hearing Set (Virtual Entry) Wed 10/18 2:57 PM
Hearing Set - (Notice - BK Notice) (Utilities, Warranty, Cash Management and Procedures Motions) Hearing scheduled 10/26/2017 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 2, 2nd Floor Customs House, 701 Broadway, Nashville, TN 37203. Related [+] (jlm)
Related: [-] 6 Notice - BK Notice
11 11 order Expedite Hearing Wed 10/18 2:56 PM
Order Setting Expedited Hearing on First Day Motions (Cash Collateral, DIP Financing, Wages and Joint Administration) Related [+]. Hearing scheduled 10/19/2017 at 03:00 PM at Courtroom 2, 2nd Floor Customs House, 701 Broadway, Nashville, TN 37203. Signed on 10/18/2017. (jlm)
Related: [-] Related Doc#:6
10 10 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Wed 10/18 12:03 PM
Meeting of Creditors Meeting of Creditors to be held on 11/17/2017 at 10:00 AM at Customs House, 701 Broadway, Room 100, Nashville, TN 37203. Last day to File Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 1/16/2018. (US TRUSTEE)
Related: [-]
9 9 trustee Notice - Chapter 11 DIP Initial UST Conf Wed 10/18 12:02 PM
Notice - Debtor(s) Initial Conference will be held on 10/19/2017 at 10:30 A.M. (US TRUSTEE)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service - BK Notice Wed 10/18 11:37 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service pursuant to Rule 2002 Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Auto Masters of West Nashville, LLC. (HILDEBRAND IV, HENRY)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service - BK Notice Wed 10/18 11:31 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service pursuant to Rule 2002 Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Auto Masters of West Nashville, LLC. (Payne, R.)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Generic Notice - BK Notice Wed 10/18 12:34 AM
Debtors' Notice of Filing of First Day Motions Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Auto Masters of West Nashville, LLC. (DUNHAM, GRIFFIN)
Related: [-]
court Case Reassigned Wed 10/18 12:12 PM
Judge Charles Walker added to case. Involvement of Judge Randal S Mashburn Terminated - related case 17-7036 (tms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2017
5 5 misc Equity Security Holders Tue 10/17 10:58 PM
Equity Security Holders Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Auto Masters of West Nashville, LLC. (DUNHAM, GRIFFIN)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Tue 10/17 10:58 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Auto Masters of West Nashville, LLC. (DUNHAM, GRIFFIN)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service - BK Notice Tue 10/17 3:33 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service pursuant to Rule 2002 Filed on the behalf of: U.S. Trustee US TRUSTEE. (COX, NATALIE)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Payment Tue 10/17 2:42 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(3:17-bk-07055) [misc,volp11] (1717.00). Receipt number 13956887. Fee amount $ 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 4 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 10/17 2:41 PM
Auto Masters of West Nashville, LLC Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount is $1717.00. (DUNHAM, GRIFFIN)
Related: [-]