California Central District Court
Judge:Stephen V Wilson
Referred: John D Early
Case #: 2:17-cv-07587
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2017
Re-opened:Oct 25, 2017
Terminated:Sep 03, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Apr 15, 2018 1:46 AM PDT
Defendant
Attorney Vikram Barr
Represented By
Tyler H Brown
Brown And Brown Attorneys At Law
contact info
Defendant
Andrew Brody
Represented By
Tyler H Brown
Brown And Brown Attorneys At Law
contact info
Defendant
Century 21 Alstars
Defendant
Judge Mary Thornton House
Represented By
Christopher A McIntire
Cummings Mcclorey Davis Acho And Associates PC
contact info
Sarah L Overton
Cummings Mcclorey Davis Acho And Associates PC
contact info
Defendant
David Popelka
Defendant
Jeff Zolot
Defendant
Meridian Capital Real Estate
1265 W.Foothill Blvd.
Upland, CA 91786
Represented By
Tyler H Brown
Brown And Brown Attorneys At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Azariah M. Ellington
10401 S 4th Avenue
Inglewood, CA 90303
Plaintiff
Mitchell D. Ellington
5129 Ruthelen Street
Los Angeles, CA 90012


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
250 250 appeal USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order Wed 01/31 7:37 AM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,239 filed by Mitchell D. Ellington, Azariah M. Ellington. CCA # 21-56157 The order warned that failure to comply would result in the automatic dismissal of the appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute, without further notice and regardless of other filings. To date, appellant has not complied with the courts order. Accordingly, this appeal is dismissed for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. All pending motions are denied as moot. This order served on the district court shall, 21 days after the date of the order, act as and for the mandate of this court. (mat)
Related: [-]